EP3878987 - MEDICAL AU-PT-PD ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tanaka Kikinzoku Kogyo K.K. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6422 / JP | For all designated states Tokushima University 2-24, Shinkura-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 770-8501 / JP | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUBO, Michimasa c/o TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K. Isehara Factory 26, Suzukawa Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1146 / JP | 02 /
GOTO, Kenji c/o TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K. ISEHARA Technical Center, 28, Suzukawa Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1146 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Kunihiro c/o TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K. ISEHARA Technical Center, 28, Suzukawa Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1146 / JP | 04 /
SHIRAISHI, Kojiro c/o TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K. ISEHARA Technical Center, 28, Suzukawa Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1146 / JP | 05 /
SHIMA, Kunihiro c/o TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K. Isehara Factory 26, Suzukawa Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1146 / JP | 06 /
KATO, Yuya c/o TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K. Isehara Factory 26, Suzukawa Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1146 / JP | 07 /
HAMADA, Kenichi c/o Tokushima University, 2-24, Shinkura-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 770-8501 / JP | 08 /
HONDA, Eiichi c/o Tokushima University, 2-24, Shinkura-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 770-8501 / JP | 09 /
TAKEGAWA, Emi c/o Tokushima University, 2-24, Shinkura-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 770-8501 / JP | [2023/17] |
Former [2021/37] | 01 /
OKUBO Michimasa c/o TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K. Isehara Factory 26, Suzukawa Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1146 / JP | ||
02 /
GOTO Kenji c/o TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K. ISEHARA Technical Center, 28, Suzukawa Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1146 / JP | |||
03 /
TANAKA Kunihiro c/o TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K. ISEHARA Technical Center, 28, Suzukawa Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1146 / JP | |||
04 /
SHIRAISHI Kojiro c/o TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K. ISEHARA Technical Center, 28, Suzukawa Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1146 / JP | |||
05 /
SHIMA Kunihiro c/o TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K. Isehara Factory 26, Suzukawa Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1146 / JP | |||
06 /
KATO Yuya c/o TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K. Isehara Factory 26, Suzukawa Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1146 / JP | |||
07 /
HAMADA Kenichi c/o Tokushima University, 2-24, Shinkura-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 770-8501 / JP | |||
08 /
HONDA Eiichi c/o Tokushima University, 2-24, Shinkura-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 770-8501 / JP | |||
09 /
TAKEGAWA Emi c/o Tokushima University, 2-24, Shinkura-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 770-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 20869680.7 | 24.09.2020 | [2021/37] | WO2020JP35902 | Priority number, date | JP20190175204 | 26.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019175204 | [2021/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021060313 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3878987 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3878987 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C22C5/02, C22F1/00, C22F1/14, A61L29/02, A61L31/02 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
A61L31/022 (EP,US);
C22C5/02 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/12109 (CN);
A61B17/1214 (CN);
A61F2/82 (CN);
A61L29/02 (EP,US);
A61M25/00 (CN);
A61M25/09 (CN);
C22C1/02 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE AU-PT-PD-LEGIERUNG | [2021/37] | English: | MEDICAL AU-PT-PD ALLOY | [2021/37] | French: | ALLIAGE AU-PT-PD MÉDICAL | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2021 | Translation filed | 09.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 06.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3784887 (SHEARD J) [A] 1-8 * column 6, lines 1-38; table 2 *; | [A]JPH08316263 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0020] - [0029]; tables 1,2 *; | [A]US6248190 (STINSON JONATHAN S [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 10, line 55 - column 13, line 53; examples 1-4 *; | [A]JP2001207226 (KYOCERA CORP) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0023] - [0034]; table 1 *; | [A]US2003034097 (OGASA KAZUO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0036] - [0052] * * paragraphs [0087] - [0094]; tables 3,4 * | International search | [A]JPH09125223 (FUKUYO HIROO) [A] 1-8 * , entire text *; | [A]WO2008032370 (HOMS ENGINEERING INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-8* , entire text *; | [A]WO2015093064 (TANAKA PRECIOUS METAL IND [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * , entire text *; | [A]JP2016094656 (TOKURIKI HONTEN KK) [A] 1-8 * , entire text *; | [A]JP2016130351 (TOKURIKI HONTEN KK) [A] 1-8 * , entire text * | Examination | US2071216 | by applicant | JP5582484B |