EP4049725 - COMBINED USE OF BIOTIN AND THIAMINE IN THE TREATMENT OF HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consejo Superior de Investigaciones Científicas (CSIC) C/ Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | For all designated states Consorcio Centro de Investigación Biomédica en Red (CIBER) C/ Monforte de Lemos, 3-5 Pabellón 5 28029 Madrid / ES | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUCAS LOZANO, José Javier Centro de Biología Molecular Severo Ochoa (CBMSO CSIC) Calle Nicolás Cabrera, 1 28049 Madrid / ES | 02 /
PICÓ DEL PINO, Sara Centro de Biología Molecular Severo Ochoa (CBMSO CSIC) Calle Nicolás Cabrera, 1 28049 Madrid / ES | 03 /
PARRAS RODRÍGUEZ, Alberto Centro de Biología Molecular Severo Ochoa (CBMSO CSIC) Calle Nicolás Cabrera, 1 28049 Madrid / ES | 04 /
SANTOS GALINDO, María Centro de Biología Molecular Severo Ochoa (CBMSO CSIC) Calle Nicolás Cabrera, 1 28049 Madrid / ES | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Pons Glorieta Rubén Darío 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20869839.9 | 23.09.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020ES70570 | Priority number, date | ES20190030825 | 24.09.2019 Original published format: ES 201930825 | [2022/35] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021058847 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | ES | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4049725 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4188, A61P25/28, A61K31/51 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P25/28 (ES);
A61K31/4188 (EP,ES,US);
A61K31/51 (EP,ES,US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61P25/00 (US)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4188, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/51, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/35] | A61P25/28, A61K31/4188, A61K31/51 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTE VERWENDUNG VON BIOTIN UND THIAMIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MORBUS HUNTINGTON | [2022/35] | English: | COMBINED USE OF BIOTIN AND THIAMINE IN THE TREATMENT OF HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE | [2022/35] | French: | UTILISATION COMBINÉE DE BIOTINE ET DE THIAMINE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE DE HUNTINGTON | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2022 | Translation filed | 20.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 18.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2018220457 (COSTANTINI ANTONIO [IT], et al); | International search | [A]US6746678 (SHAPIRO HOWARD K [US]) [A] 1-9* , column 1, second paragraph; column 31; column 58; claim 2. *; | [A] - Tabarki Brahim, Al-Hashem Amal, Alfadhel Majid, "Biotin-Thiamine-Responsive Basal Ganglia Disease", Gene revieuws, (20131121), pages 1 - 12, XP055808863 [A] 1-9 * page 1, first and last paragraphs; page 2, line 5; page 3, first and second paragraphs; page 4, next to last paragraph. * | [A] - Gruber Beata, Krzysztoń-Russjan Jolanta, Bubko Irena, Syska Jarosław, Jaworska Małgorzata, Zmysłowski Adam, Rosłon Magdalena, Drozd Janina, Drozd Ewa, Majorczyk Edyta, Anuszewska Elżbieta, "Role of thiamine in Huntington’s disease pathogenesis: In vitro studies", Advances in Clinical and Experimental Medicine, PL , (20170831), vol. 26, no. 5, doi:10.17219/acem/63091, ISSN 1899-5276, pages 751 - 760, XP055918963 [A] 1-9 * Page 752, right column, second paragraph; page 756, left column, first paragraph; page 760, left column, first paragraph. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.17219/acem/63091 | by applicant | CN1725204 | WO2006053067 | - YAMAMOTO et al., Cell, (20000000), vol. 101, pages 57 - 66 | - DIAZ-HERNANDEZ et al., J. Neurosci., (20050000), vol. 25, pages 9773 - 9781 | - TABRIZI SJ et al., N Engl J Med., (20190000), vol. 380, no. 24, pages 2307 - 2316 | - REAGAN-SHAW S, "Dose translation from animal to human studies revisited", FASEB J, (20070000), vol. 22, pages 659 - 661, XP007916336 | - MANGIARINI et al., Cell, (19960000), vol. 87, no. 3, pages 493 - 506 | - ORTIZ-ZAPATER et al., Nat Med., (20110000), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 83 - 90 | - HUANG DA et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20090000), vol. 37, no. 1, pages 1 - 13 | - PIQUE et al., Cell, (20080000), vol. 132, no. 3, pages 434 - 48 | - RITCHIE et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20150000), vol. 43, page e47 | - GRUETTER, R, Magn. Reson. Med., (19930000), vol. 29, pages 804 - 811 |