EP4050000 - ARYL SULFIDE CONTAINING BENZYLAMINE STRUCTURE, SYNTHESIS METHOD THEREFOR AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shandong Kangqiao Bio-Technology Co., Ltd. Luyi Town Indusrial Park Boxing County Binzhou, Shandong 256500 / CN | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Ning Luyi Town Industrial Park, Boxing County Binzhou, Shandong 256500 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Yingshuai Luyi Town Industrial Park, Boxing County Binzhou, Shandong 256500 / CN | 03 /
LI, Xianjiang Luyi Town Industrial Park, Boxing County Binzhou, Shandong 256500 / CN | 04 /
XIAO, Jian Luyi Town Industrial Park, Boxing County Binzhou, Shandong 256500 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Xiangwei Luyi Town Industrial Park, Boxing County Binzhou, Shandong 256500 / CN | 06 /
LIU, Ruibin Luyi Town Industrial Park, Boxing County Binzhou, Shandong 256500 / CN | 07 /
SHENG, Guozhu Luyi Town Industrial Park, Boxing County Binzhou, Shandong 256500 / CN | 08 /
FENG, Ruijie Luyi Town Industrial Park, Boxing County Binzhou, Shandong 256500 / CN | 09 /
XIANG, Xiaozhong Luyi Town Industrial Park, Boxing County Binzhou, Shandong 256500 / CN | 10 /
CUI, Yingrui Luyi Town Industrial Park, Boxing County Binzhou, Shandong 256500 / CN | 11 /
CHEN, Yu Luyi Town Industrial Park, Boxing County Binzhou, Shandong 256500 / CN | 12 /
WANG, Shiling Luyi Town Industrial Park, Boxing County Binzhou, Shandong 256500 / CN | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Scholl, Matthias Friedrichstraße 114a 10117 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/35] | Niburska, Danuta Kancelaria Patentowa Al. 3 Maja 68 B 76-200 Slupsk / PL | Application number, filing date | 20869958.7 | 31.08.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020CN00198 | Priority number, date | CN201910900234 | 23.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910900234 | CN202010796915 | 10.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010796915 | [2022/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021056922 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4050000 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07C317/36, C07C323/36, A01N33/18, A01N37/34, A01N37/44, A01N41/10, A01P7/02 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
C07C323/36 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C317/36 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A01N41/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A01N33/10 (EP,US);
A01N33/18 (EP,US);
A01N37/34 (EP,US);
A01N37/44 (EP,US);
A01N41/12 (CN,KR);
A01P7/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | C07D239/49, C07C323/33, C07D213/16, C07D213/56, A01N43/40, A01N43/48, A01N47/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | ARYLSULFIDHALTIGE BENZYLAMINSTRUKTUR, VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/35] | English: | ARYL SULFIDE CONTAINING BENZYLAMINE STRUCTURE, SYNTHESIS METHOD THEREFOR AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2022/35] | French: | SULFURE D'ARYLE CONTENANT UNE STRUCTURE DE BENZYLAMINE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE ET SON UTILISATION | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2022 | Translation filed | 19.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 25.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0000156 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-11* last two compounds of page 16; last compound of page 18;; claim 1 *; | [X]US4339461 (KING WILLIAM F) [X] 1 * compounds 5 and 7 of table 1 *; | [X]WO2013165606 (US HEALTH [US], et al) [X] 1 * example 192 *; | [AD]WO2018015852 (INSECTICIDES (INDIA) LTD [IN], et al) [AD] 1-11 * examples;; claim 1 *; | [X] - PANG SHAOFENG ET AL, "Oxidative amination of benzylic alkanes with nitrobenzene derivatives as nitrogen sources", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM , NL, (20161228), vol. 57, no. 52, doi:10.1016/J.TETLET.2016.11.057, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 5872 - 5876, XP029830312 [X] 1 * compound c12 of scheme 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2016.11.057 | [X] - PANG SHAO-FENG ET AL, "Co@ N-graphene / C Catalyzed Oxidative Amination of Toluene Derivatives", FEZI CUIHUA-JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS(CHINA), CN, (20170430), vol. 31, no. 2, doi:10.16084/j.cnki.issn1001-3555.2017.02.006, ISSN 1001-3555, pages 105 - 120, XP055795784 [X] 1 * compounds c9, c24 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.16084/j.cnki.issn1001-3555.2017.02.006 | International search | [X]US4339461 (KING WILLIAM F) [X] 1, * see specific compounds 5 and 7 in table 1 *; | [A]JP5280972B (NIPPON SODA CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * compounds in table 2 *; | [X]WO2013165606 (US HEALTH [US], et al) [X] 1, * see embodiment 192 *; | [X]CN109803956 (INSECTICIDES INDIA LTD) [X] 7-11 * see claims 1-11, description pages 34-38 *; | [X] - Pang Shao-Feng, Yuan Hang-Kong;Wu Ya-Juan;Shi Feng, "Co@N-graphene/C catalyzed oxidative amination of toluene derivatives", Fezi cuihua-Journal of Molecular Catalysis(China), (20170430), vol. 31, no. 2, doi:10.16084/j.cnki.issn1001-3555.2017.02.006, ISSN 1001-3555, pages 105 - 120, XP055795784 [X] 1, * pp. 105-120 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.16084/j.cnki.issn1001-3555.2017.02.006 | by applicant | WO9955668 | JP2011042611 | TW201127291 | JP2011219419 | CN103664811 | JP2015036377 | CN104995193 | CN105517995 | US2017226107 | WO2018015852 | WO2018051252 | CN108290886 | CN109803956 |