EP4018114 - ISOLATION VALVE FOR FLUID FLOW REGULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 20.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oceaneering International, Inc. 11911 FM 529 Houston, Texas 77041 / US | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FJELDSAA, Morten Hellemyrlia 34 4628 Kristiansand, Vest Agder / NO | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Potter, Julian Mark WP Thompson 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20871099.6 | 30.09.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020US53387 | Priority number, date | US201962910355P | 03.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962910355 P | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021067346 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4018114 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/074, E21B34/04, F16K3/04 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
F16K3/04 (EP);
F16K31/46 (US);
E21B34/04 (EP);
F16K11/044 (US);
F16K25/005 (US);
F16K51/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | F16K11/074, E21B34/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | ISOLIERVENTIL FÜR DURCHFLUSSREGELUNG | [2022/26] | English: | ISOLATION VALVE FOR FLUID FLOW REGULATION | [2022/26] | French: | SOUPAPE D'ISOLEMENT POUR RÉGULATION D'ÉCOULEMENT DE FLUIDE | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 19.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3796232 (DALTON T) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4756647 (FASSBINDER HANS-GEORG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, lines 23-31 *; | [A]GB2340917 (POND RICHARD JAMES [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]DE102009028652 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2527339 (OLIVER VALVETEK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2018163879 (SMITH III ROBERT E [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0082]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [Y]US3556151 (MASUDA KENGI) [Y] 9-12 * Entire document especially col 2, In 55 - col 3, In 5 and figs. 1-6 *; | [Y]EP0653581 (GROHE ARMATUREN FRIEDRICH [DE]) [Y] 14 * Entire document especially para [0006] and fig. 1 *; | [A]US2001013369 (SASADA EIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * Entire document *; | [Y]WO2006046796 (NANO COATECH CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 2, 16 * Entire document especially para [38], [42], [46] and figs. 4-7 *; | [A]US2013284959 (HOCHGRAEBER HERMANN [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * Entire document *; | [A]US2014048734 (WITKOWSKI BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20* Entire document *; | [YA]US2018163879 (SMITH III ROBERT E [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * Entire document especially para [0056], [0059] and figs. 1-4B * [A] 20; | [YA]US2019264824 (ZONNEVELD PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * Entire document especially para [0040], [0052]-[0053], [0075] and figs. 1-9 * [A] 20 |