EP3969684 - SECURING MEMBER AND WALL STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nichiha Corporation 12, Siodome-cho Minato-ku Nagoya-si, Aichi 4550846 / JP | [2024/02] |
Former [2022/12] | For all designated states Nichiha Corporation 12, Shiodome-cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 455-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAWADA, Yohei c/o Nichiha Corporation 12, Siotome-cho Minato-ku Nagoya-si, Aichi 455-8550 / JP | 02 /
HAMADA, Kohei c/o Nichiha Corporation 12, Siotome-cho Minato-ku Nagoya-si, Aichi 455-8550 / JP | [2023/44] |
Former [2022/12] | 01 /
SAWADA Yohei c/o Nichiha Corporation, 12, Siotome-cho, Minato- ku Nagoya-si, Aichi 455-8550 / JP | ||
02 /
HAMADA Kohei c/o Nichiha Corporation, 12, Siotome-cho, Minato- ku Nagoya-si, Aichi 455-8550 / JP | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 20871422.0 | 29.09.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020JP36903 | Priority number, date | JP20190179209 | 30.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019179209 | JP20200104976 | 18.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020104976 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021065906 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3969684 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3969684 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/08 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
E04F13/0826 (EP,CN,US);
E04F13/0846 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT UND WANDSTRUKTUR | [2022/12] | English: | SECURING MEMBER AND WALL STRUCTURE | [2022/12] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE FIXATION ET STRUCTURE DE PAROI | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 26.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6688060 (SAWADA KOJI [JP]); | [Y]JP2006083647 (KOBE STEEL LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2013245513 (YUUSU KITAURA KK); | [Y]JP2015021353 (DAIWA HOUSE IND); | [Y]JP2016125281 (YOUTH KITAURA CO LTD); | [Y]US2017268237 (SUZUKI KENJI [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH1088769 (DAIKEN TRADE & INDUSTRY); | [Y]JP2006083647 (KOBE STEEL LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2015021353 (DAIWA HOUSE IND); | [Y]JP2016125281 (YOUTH KITAURA CO LTD) | by applicant | US6688060 | JP2013245513 | JP2015021353 | JP2015074947 | JP2016125281 | JP2017166227 | US2017268237 |