Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
09.12.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] |
09.12.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] |
26.09.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.07.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
15.07.2022 | Change - classification | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
15.07.2022 | Change - classification | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
04.03.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] |
04.03.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] |
20.02.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.02.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
04.01.2022 | Change - representative | |
04.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.04.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
10.04.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.04.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |