EP3979373 - ELECTRODE AND SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Soon Hyung LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Yong Jun LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Tae Gon LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20871814.8 | 29.09.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020KR13394 | Priority number, date | KR20190123261 | 04.10.2019 Original published format: KR 20190123261 | [2022/14] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021066557 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3979373 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/62, H01M4/13, H01M10/052 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
H01M4/625 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR);
H01M4/13 (CN,KR,US);
C01B32/158 (EP);
H01M2004/021 (US);
H01M2004/028 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | ELEKTRODE UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE DAMIT | [2022/14] | English: | ELECTRODE AND SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME | [2022/14] | French: | ÉLECTRODE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE LA COMPRENANT | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2022 | Translation filed | 03.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 10.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014332731 (MA JUN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* claims 1, 8 *; | [XI]CN107946561 (SHENZHEN BAK BATTERY CO LTD) [X] 1,3,13 * claim 1 * [I] 2,4-12,14,15; | [X]WO2019016925 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * example 1; claim 1 * | International search | [Y]KR20130094286 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [Y] 12-14 * See claims 1 and 9. *; | [Y]KR20170063402 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-16 * See claims 1 and 5; and paragraphs [0078], [0081] and [0094]. *; | [A]KR101834324B (ROUTE JJ CO., LTD.) [A] 1-16* See claim 1. *; | [Y]KR20180063151 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 2-5,14 * See claim 1; and paragraphs [0026]-[0028] and [0033]. *; | [Y]US2019157681 (HO KAM PIU [HK], et al) [Y] 1-16 * See claims 1, 6, 18 and 19. * |