EP3973154 - THROTTLE REPLACING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kristani, Filip 525 Spring Valley Road Unit C Maywood, NJ 07607 / US | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Keilitz Haines & Partner Patentanwälte PartGmbB Nigerstraße 4 81675 München / DE | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 20871827.0 | 28.09.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020US53160 | Priority number, date | US201916589772 | 01.10.2019 Original published format: US201916589772 | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021067201 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3973154 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F02B33/22, F02B33/44, F02B37/16, F02B77/14, F02D41/00, F02D13/02 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
F02B33/446 (EP,KR,US);
F02B77/14 (EP,KR,US);
F02B33/22 (EP,KR);
F02B37/162 (EP,KR,US);
F02D23/005 (EP);
F02D41/0007 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/13] | F02B33/22, F02B23/10, F02B33/00, F02B33/02, F02B33/06, F02B41/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | DROSSELAUSTAUSCHVORRICHTUNG | [2022/13] | English: | THROTTLE REPLACING DEVICE | [2022/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REMPLACEMENT DU PAPILLON DES GAZ | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 07.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007221145 (FORNER CHARLES K [US], et al); | [X]US2011308505 (MELDOLESI RICCARDO [GB]); | [A]US2012255296 (PHILLIPS FORD A [US], et al); | [X]US9297295 (SCUDERI STEPHEN P [US], et al) | International search | [A]FR1424116 (GUAZZELLI) [A] 1-4 * machine translation *; | [A]US5785015 (PHILIPPE LUC [ES], et al) [A] 1-4 * entire document *; | [A]US6019075 (GALKA WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * entire document *; | [A]US6397579 (NEGRE GUY [FR]) [A] 1-4* entire document * |