EP4037898 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ATTACHING AN UNDERLAY ELEMENT TO A BOARD ELEMENT AND AN ASSOCIATED BOARD ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ceraloc Innovation AB Prästavägen 513 263 64 Viken / SE | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSEFSSON, Per Bruzeliusgatan 2 256 54 RAMLÖSA / SE | 02 /
NILSSON, Christoffer Bruksgatan 7B lgh 1102 252 23 HELSINGBORG / SE | 03 /
HÅKANSSON, Niclas Syllstensgatan 19 263 65 VIKEN / SE | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Välinge Innovation AB Patent Department Prästavägen 513 263 64 Viken / SE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 20871983.1 | 02.10.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020SE50931 | Priority number, date | SE20190051134 | 04.10.2019 Original published format: SE 1951134 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021066725 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4037898 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B32B37/12, // E04F15/02, B32B3/14, B32B7/02, B32B9/02, B32B13/04, B32B19/04, B32B21/02, B32B27/08 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
B32B7/12 (EP,KR);
B32B37/1292 (EP,KR,US);
E04F15/0215 (KR,US);
B32B13/04 (EP,KR);
B32B13/045 (EP,KR);
B32B19/04 (EP,KR);
B32B19/047 (EP,KR);
B32B21/02 (EP,KR);
B32B21/042 (EP,KR);
B32B21/047 (EP,KR);
B32B21/14 (EP,KR);
B32B27/08 (EP,KR);
B32B27/12 (EP,KR);
B32B27/20 (EP,KR);
B32B27/22 (EP,KR);
B32B27/302 (EP,KR);
B32B27/304 (EP,KR);
B32B27/32 (EP,KR);
B32B27/36 (EP,KR);
B32B3/06 (EP,KR);
B32B3/14 (EP,KR);
B32B3/266 (EP,KR);
B32B3/30 (EP,KR);
B32B37/0076 (US);
B32B37/22 (EP,KR);
B32B38/0004 (US);
B32B5/028 (EP,KR);
B32B5/18 (EP,KR);
B32B7/02 (EP,KR);
B32B7/06 (EP,KR);
B32B7/14 (EP,KR);
B32B9/02 (EP,KR);
B32B9/042 (EP,KR);
B32B9/045 (EP,KR);
B32B2250/02 (EP,KR);
B32B2260/026 (EP,KR);
B32B2260/046 (EP,KR);
B32B2262/067 (EP,KR);
B32B2262/101 (EP,KR);
B32B2264/067 (EP,KR);
B32B2264/10 (EP,KR);
B32B2264/104 (EP,KR);
B32B2266/0207 (EP,KR);
B32B2266/0221 (EP,KR);
B32B2266/0228 (EP,KR);
B32B2266/025 (EP,KR);
B32B2266/0264 (EP,KR);
B32B2266/0278 (EP,KR);
B32B2266/06 (EP,KR);
B32B2266/08 (EP,KR);
B32B2307/538 (EP,KR);
B32B2307/546 (EP);
B32B2307/7246 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2307/748 (EP);
B32B2309/72 (US);
B32B2419/00 (EP);
B32B2419/04 (EP);
B32B2479/00 (EP);
B32B2607/00 (EP,US);
E04F13/0885 (KR,US);
E04F15/02038 (EP);
E04F15/105 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/32] | B32B3/30, B32B27/00, E04F15/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Validation states | KH | 13.04.2022 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES UNTERLAGEELEMENTS AN EINEM PLATTENELEMENT UND ZUGEHÖRIGES PLATTENELEMENT | [2022/32] | English: | A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ATTACHING AN UNDERLAY ELEMENT TO A BOARD ELEMENT AND AN ASSOCIATED BOARD ELEMENT | [2022/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE FIXATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE COUCHE INFÉRIEURE À UN ÉLÉMENT DE PANNEAU ET ÉLÉMENT DE PANNEAU ASSOCIÉ | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 15.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO2014007738 (VAELINGE FLOORING TECHNOLOGY AB [SE]) [ID] 1-15 * page 11, line 21 - line 26 * * page 14, line 9 - line 17 * * page 15, line 1 - line 3 ** figure 6d * | International search | [X]JPH09144276 (IG TECH RES INC) [X] 1-15 * ; paragraphs [0001], [0004]-[0008], [0010]; figures 1-5; claim 1; WPI abstract; Machine translation *; | [X]JPH09144277 (IG TECH RES INC) [X] 1-15 * ; paragraphs [0001 ], [0004]-[0008], [0010], [0015]; figures 1,4,7-8; claim 1; WPI abstract; Machine translation *; | [A]WO03106783 (ALTRO LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * ; page 2, line 26 - line 28 *; | [A]JP2004167762 (TOYO PLYWOOD CO LTD) [A] 1-15* ; paragraphs [0003]-[0010]; figures 1-2; claim 1; WPI abstract; Machine translation *; | [DA]WO2014007738 (VAELINGE FLOORING TECHNOLOGY AB [SE]) [DA] 1-15 * ; whole document *; | [X]US2014202626 (SENNIK STEVE [CA]) [X] 1-15 * ; paragraphs [0051]-[0056], [0064]; figures 3,6; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2014139294 (DENG CIYI [CN]) [A] 1-15 * ; WPI abstract; Machine translation: p. 4 I. 9-12 *; | [A]US2018044922 (COLE DAWN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * ; paragraph [0040] *; | [A]EP3415702 (SHINKO KASEI CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * ; paragraph [0019] * |