EP4018484 - DEVICE FOR GENERATING ELECTRICITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clearvue Technologies Ltd 16 Ord Street West Perth, Western Australia 6005 / AU | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYFORD, Jamie c/- Clearvue Technologies Ltd 16 Ord Street West Perth, Western Australia 6005 / AU | 02 /
ROSENBERG, Victor c/- Clearvue Technologies Ltd 16 Ord Street West Perth, Western Australia 6005 / AU | 03 /
COONEN, Steven c/- Clearvue Technologies Ltd 16 Ord Street West Perth, Western Australia 6005 / AU | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | IPrime Rentsch Kaelin AG Hirschengraben 1 8001 Zürich / CH | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20872804.8 | 01.10.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020AU51052 | Priority number, date | AU20190903698 | 01.10.2019 Original published format: AU 2019903698 | AU20190904261 | 12.11.2019 Original published format: AU 2019904261 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021062478 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4018484 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0468, B60J1/20, E06B1/36, E06B3/663, E06B7/28, H01L31/049, H02S20/00, H02S20/26, H02S20/30, H02S30/10, H02S40/20, E06B3/67, H01L31/048, E06B3/66, H01L31/042 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
H01L31/048 (EP,KR);
H02S30/10 (AU,KR);
H02S20/26 (EP,AU,KR,US);
E06B3/66 (EP);
E06B3/6715 (EP,US);
E06B7/28 (US);
E06B9/24 (US);
H01L31/042 (EP);
H01L31/0488 (EP,AU);
H01L31/0504 (AU,KR);
H02S40/22 (KR,US);
E06B2009/2417 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | H01L31/05, H01L31/048, H01L31/0468, H02S20/26, H01L31/0475 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM ERZEUGEN VON ELEKTRIZITÄT | [2022/26] | English: | DEVICE FOR GENERATING ELECTRICITY | [2022/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'ÉLECTRICITÉ | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 16.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202008000678U (GLUSKE BKV GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1a,1b * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0046]; figures 2-6 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0050]; figure 7 *; | [X]WO2017105823 (SUNPOWER CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,11 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]CN107068789 (NINGBO 3D SOLARTECH LTD) [X] 1-3,13,14 * abstract * * automatic translation referring to fig. 5 and 7;; figures 5,7 *; | [A]EP3348737 (FAKRO PP SP Z O O [PL]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0018] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1,2,3 *; | [A]WO2019016118 (MEYER BURGER SWITZERLAND AG [CH]) [A] 1-15* page 7, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 1; figures 1-6 * | International search | [X]US2013100675 (HAN SIJIN [US], et al) [X] 1 * Abstract, [0034], [0068], Figures 2, 7B and 8C *; | [A]US2013240011 (LUCH DANIEL [US]) [A] 1-37* [0100] and Figure 13 *; | [XA]WO2015024046 (TROPIGLAS TECHNOLOGIES LTD [AU]) [X] 1-25 and 34 * Abstract, Page 1 line 33 - Page 2 line 5, Page 7 line 34 - Page 8 line 4, Page 12 lines 12-17, Page 27 lines 20-24, and Figures 1 and 6 * [A] 26-33 and 35-37; | [A]US10084104 (MORAD RATSON [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * Col 3 lines 6-15 and Figure 1 * |