EP4037476 - SPRAYER WITH ARTICULATED ARM AND SENSOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Farm Improvements Limited 49 Fisher Avenue Beckenham Christchurch 8023 / NZ | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNOTT, Gary 49 Fisher Avenue Beckenham Christchurch 8023 / NZ | 02 /
CHEMALY, Grant c/- Farm Improvements Limited 8 Halls Place Middleton Christchurch 8024 / NZ | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Lock, Graham James, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP Unit A, Faraday Court Faraday Road Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9PU / GB | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 20873235.4 | 29.09.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020NZ50111 | Priority number, date | NZ19757773 | 02.10.2019 Original published format: NZ 19757773 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021066660 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4037476 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A01J7/04, A01K1/12, B25J19/02, G01B11/02, B05B12/12, B05B15/70 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
A01J7/04 (EP,AU,IL,US);
A01K1/12 (EP,IL,US);
A01K13/001 (IL,US);
A01K13/003 (AU);
B05B12/122 (EP,IL);
B05B15/652 (IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/32] | A01J7/04, A01K1/12, B25J19/02, G01B11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Title | German: | ZERSTÄUBER MIT GELENKARM UND SENSORSYSTEM | [2022/32] | English: | SPRAYER WITH ARTICULATED ARM AND SENSOR SYSTEM | [2022/32] | French: | PULVÉRISATEUR À BRAS ARTICULÉ ET SYSTÈME DE CAPTEUR | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 16.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012024091 (KAWABUCHI ICHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US2015366156 (HOLMSTRÖM KERSTIN [SE], et al); | [I]US2018359983 (VAN DEN BERG KAREL [NL], et al) | International search | [A]US5347135 (HARRIS DAVID E [US], et al); | [X]US5678506 (VAN DER BERG KAREL [NL], et al); | [A]US2003202872 (MORI HIROKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2004032974 (KRIESEL MARSHALL S [US]); | [X]EP1537774 (LELY ENTPR AG [CH]); | [A]WO2010031632 (DELAVAL HOLDING AB [SE], et al); | [X]US2012200674 (HOFMAN HENK [NL], et al); | [A]US2012260863 (ARNOTT GARY [NZ], et al); | [A]US2013247827 (ANDERSSON JAN-ERIK [SE], et al); | [X]US2015366156 (HOLMSTRÖM KERSTIN [SE], et al); | [X]US2016066529 (HOFMAN HENK [NL], et al); | [X]US2016309674 (VAN DER SLUIS PETER WILLEM [NL]); | [X]US2017020100 (HOFMAN HENK [NL], et al); | [X]US2018020632 (KRONE OTTO [DE], et al); | [A]US2018049396 (FORESMAN MARK A [US], et al); | [XA]US2019230890 (HENRY JOEL R [US], et al) |