EP4036863 - HUMAN BODY MODEL RECONSTRUCTION METHOD AND RECONSTRUCTION SYSTEM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Zhong 2479 E Bayshore Rd, Suite 110 Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 02 /
XU, Yi 2479 E Bayshore Rd, Suite 110 Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 03 /
QUAN, Shuxue 2479 E Bayshore Rd, Suite 110 Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Ipside 7-9 Allée Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/31] | Ipside 7-9 Allées Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 20873287.5 | 25.09.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020CN117916 | Priority number, date | US201962908314P | 30.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962908314 P | [2022/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021063271 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4036863 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/00, G06T15/04 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
G06T15/04 (EP);
G06T17/20 (US);
G06T17/00 (EP);
G06T19/20 (US);
G06T7/11 (US);
G06T2207/30201 (US);
G06T2219/2004 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR REKONSTRUKTION DES MENSCHLICHEN KÖRPERMODELLS SOWIE SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/31] | English: | HUMAN BODY MODEL RECONSTRUCTION METHOD AND RECONSTRUCTION SYSTEM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RECONSTRUCTION DE MODÈLE DE CORPS HUMAIN, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE ASSOCIÉ | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2022 | Translation filed | 29.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 27.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - WENG CHUNG-YI ET AL, "Photo Wake-Up: 3D Character Animation From a Single Photo", 2019 IEEE/CVF CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CVPR), IEEE, (20190615), doi:10.1109/CVPR.2019.00606, pages 5901 - 5910, XP033686713 [X] 1-6,10-14 * sections 3-5 * [Y] 7-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2019.00606 | [YD] - NATSUME RYOTA ET AL, "SiCloPe: Silhouette-Based Clothed People", 2019 IEEE/CVF CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CVPR), IEEE, (20190615), doi:10.1109/CVPR.2019.00461, pages 4475 - 4485, XP033687199 [YD] 7-9 * section 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2019.00461 | [XP] - LI ZHONG ET AL, "3D Human Avatar Digitization from a Single Image", 20191114; 20191114 - 20191116, (20191114), doi:10.1145/3359997.3365707, ISBN 978-1-4503-7002-8, pages 1 - 8, XP058448411 [XP] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/3359997.3365707 |