EP4044391 - MULTIPURPOSE MOBILE POWER SUPPLY AND ASSEMBLY OF MULTIPURPOSE MOBILE POWER SUPPLY AND ELECTRIC TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Lera New Energy Power Technology Co., Ltd. No. 398 Longtan Road Yuelin Street Fenghua District Ningbo, Zhejiang 315505 / CN | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Hongbo No. 398, Longtan Road, Yuelin Street, Fenghua District Ningbo, Zhejiang 315505 / CN | 02 /
DAI, Jianhong No. 398, Longtan Road, Yuelin Street, Fenghua District Ningbo, Zhejiang 315505 / CN | 03 /
KE, Hengzhao No. 398, Longtan Road, Yuelin Street, Fenghua District Ningbo, Zhejiang 315505 / CN | 04 /
XU, Naiqian No. 398, Longtan Road, Yuelin Street, Fenghua District Ningbo, Zhejiang 315505 / CN | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20873585.2 | 29.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020CN118682 | Priority number, date | CN201921698252U | 11.10.2019 Original published format: CN 201921698252 U | CN201921698254U | 11.10.2019 Original published format: CN 201921698254 U | CN201921698268U | 11.10.2019 Original published format: CN 201921698268 U | CN201921698370U | 11.10.2019 Original published format: CN 201921698370 U | [2022/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021068791 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4044391 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H01M10/42, H01M10/44 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
H01M10/425 (EP,US);
H02J7/0063 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/44 (EP);
H02J7/0042 (EP);
H02J7/0044 (US);
H01M2010/4271 (EP,US);
H01M2220/30 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | MOBILE MEHRZWECKSTROMVERSORGUNG UND ANORDNUNG VON MEHRZWECKMOBILSTROMVERSORGUNG UND ELEKTROWERKZEUG | [2022/33] | English: | MULTIPURPOSE MOBILE POWER SUPPLY AND ASSEMBLY OF MULTIPURPOSE MOBILE POWER SUPPLY AND ELECTRIC TOOL | [2022/33] | French: | ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE MOBILE MULTIFONCTIONNELLE ET MONTAGE D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE MOBILE MULTIFONCTIONNELLE ET D'OUTIL ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2022 | Translation filed | 10.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 06.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US8671509 (REED BRETT [US], et al) [Y] 6-20* abstract *; | [XY]US2016226277 (WENGER KEVIN [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0002] - [0028] - [0047] - [0078]; figures 1-14 * [Y] 6-20; | [XY]CN206060252U (CHANGZHOU GLOBE CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * pages 3,4; figures 1-3 * [Y] 6-20; | [A]WO2017189786 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [Y]US2018102706 (GAO ZHENDONG [CN], et al) [Y] 6-20 * abstract *; | [A]CN207353352U (NANJING CHERVON IND CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |