Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022373746 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962913051 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020US54816 | 08.10.2020 | US202017767005 | 08.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4042216 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2023 | A4 | EP4042216 | 17.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962913051 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020US54816 | 08.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112022006814 | 28.06.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201962913051 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020US54816 | 08.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022004396 | 18.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962913051 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020US54816 | 08.10.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021072100 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962913051 | 09.10.2019 |