EP3966660 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE OF SLIDING TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KO, Sungchan 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Donghun 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
SEO, Jooho 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20873705.6 | 08.09.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020KR12116 | Priority number, date | KR20190124015 | 07.10.2019 Original published format: KR 20190124015 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021071107 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3966660 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, G09F9/30 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
G06F1/1624 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/1652 (EP,CN,US);
G06F1/1637 (EP,KR);
G06F1/1647 (US);
G06F1/1656 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F1/1681 (EP);
G06F1/1686 (EP,KR);
G06F3/04817 (US);
H04M1/0237 (EP);
H04M1/0268 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES GLEITVORRICHTUNG | [2022/11] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE OF SLIDING TYPE | [2022/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE DE TYPE COULISSANT | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 11.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3547101 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-9,15* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2014211399 (O'BRIEN PAUL M [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [17]-[21]; and figure 1 *; | [A]CN108833618 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS CO LTD) [A] 1-15* claims 1-13; and figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US2018374452 (CHOI KYU-HYUN [KR], et al) [Y] 10-15 * paragraphs [5], [58] *; | [A]CN208956089U (NINGBO SUNNY OPTICAL TECH CO) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-21; and figures 1-28 *; | [Y]US2019305237 (SHIN JAEYOUNG [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [94], [153]-[158], [206]; and figures 4A-9B * | by applicant | EP3547101 |