EP4042363 - SMART ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHARGING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SITUATIONAL MONITORING AND ALERTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amplify Cleantech Solutions Private Limted 4th Floor, BMTC Building Yeshwanthpur, Karnataka Bengaluru 560022 / IN | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JASTI, Krishna Karthik Plot Number 72, Road Number 9, Jubilee Hills Telangana, Hyderabad 500033 / IN | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Purdylucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20874063.9 | 08.10.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020IB59447 | Priority number, date | IN201941041218 | 11.10.2019 Original published format: IN201941041218 | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021070098 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4042363 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/30, G06Q10/02, B60L53/50, B60L53/65, B60L53/66, B60L53/68, G06Q50/06 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
G06Q50/06 (EP,GB);
G06Q50/40 (EP,GB);
B60L53/65 (EP,GB,US);
B60L53/62 (US);
B60L53/66 (EP,GB,US);
B60L53/68 (EP,GB,US);
G06Q10/02 (EP,GB);
B60L2250/16 (US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,GB);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,GB);
Y02T90/12 (EP,GB);
Y02T90/16 (GB);
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | G06Q50/30, G06Q10/02, B60L53/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES ELEKTRISCHES FAHRZEUGLADESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SITUATIONSÜBERWACHUNG UND WARNUNG | [2022/33] | English: | SMART ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHARGING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SITUATIONAL MONITORING AND ALERTING | [2022/33] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CHARGE DE VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE INTELLIGENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DE SITUATION ET D'ALERTE | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 27.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017337448 (NG CHIU SHING [HK], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10 * paragraphs [0007] - [0015] - [0027] - [0070]; figures 1-10 *[I] 3 | International search | [Y]US2013127417 (KARNER DONALD B [US], et al) [Y] 1-10* (abstract, figures 0020-0022, 0033, 0047, 0060) *; | [Y]US2017337448 (NG CHIU SHING [HK], et al) [Y] 1-10 * (whole document) * |