Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022241275 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217718052 | 11.04.2022 | US201962913055 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020US55146 | 09.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220079903 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962913055 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020US55146 | 09.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022551652 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962913055 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020US55146 | 09.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116407639 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202080084419 | 09.10.2020 | US201962913055 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020US55146 | 09.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114761009 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962913055 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020US55146 | 09.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3154144 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962913055 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020US55146 | 09.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020364150 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962913055 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020US55146 | 09.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4041237 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2023 | A4 | EP4041237 | 17.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962913055 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020US55146 | 09.10.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021072319 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962913055 | 09.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202128173 | 01.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962913055 | 09.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202128174 | 01.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962913055 | 09.10.2019 |