EP4033840 - CARRIER CONFIGURATION METHOD AND RELATED APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Yongzhao Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
TANG, Zhenghua Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Jibin Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
JI, Xianyong Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/30] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20874756.8 | 25.09.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020CN117770 | Priority number, date | CN201910964026 | 11.10.2019 Original published format: CN201910964026 | [2022/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021068762 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4033840 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W72/12 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
H04L5/0092 (EP);
H04W72/0453 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04L5/003 (CN);
H04L5/005 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/30] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TRÄGERKONFIGURATION UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/30] | English: | CARRIER CONFIGURATION METHOD AND RELATED APPARATUS | [2022/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION DE PORTEUSE ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2022 | Translation filed | 21.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 17.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2019097432 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]WO2019138500 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); |