EP4043817 - COOLING SYSTEM OF REFRIGERATION APPLIANCE HAVING IN-DOOR VARIABLE COMPARTMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haier Smart Home Co., Ltd. No.1 Haier Road, Laoshan Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | For all designated states Qingdao Haier Refrigerator Co., Ltd Haier Industry Park Haier Road No. 1 Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | For all designated states Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street Center Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIJAYAN, Vineeth Corporation Trust Center, 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | 02 /
KYRIACOU, Stephanos Corporation Trust Center, 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/33] | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20874777.4 | 30.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020CN119350 | Priority number, date | US201916595642 | 08.10.2019 Original published format: US201916595642 | [2022/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021068837 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4043817 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/04, F25D11/02, F25B5/00, F25B41/385, F25D17/06, F25D23/02 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
F25D23/04 (EP,US);
F25B41/385 (EP);
F25B5/00 (EP);
F25D17/065 (EP);
F25D23/025 (EP);
F25D23/10 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | F25D23/04, F25D11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | KÜHLSYSTEM EINES KÜHLGERÄTES MIT TÜRINTEGRIERTEN VARIABLEN FÄCHERN | [2022/33] | English: | COOLING SYSTEM OF REFRIGERATION APPLIANCE HAVING IN-DOOR VARIABLE COMPARTMENTS | [2022/33] | French: | SYSTÈME DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'APPAREIL DE RÉFRIGÉRATION DOTÉ DE COMPARTIMENTS VARIABLES INTERNES | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2022 | Translation filed | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 13.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1930671 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]WO2008078876 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [Y] 8,15 * paragraph [0064] * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [Y]US2011162392 (LIM CHANG HAK [KR], et al) [Y] 3-7,11-14 * figures 1,2,3A,3B,4C,5 *; | [XY]KR20170116909 (HEFEI MIDEA REFRIGERATOR CO [CN]) [X] 1-7,9-14 * abstract * * figures 1,5-7 * [Y] 8,15; | [XY]EP3236182 (DONGBU DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0027] * * figures 1,2,6 * [Y] 3-7,11-14; | [A]EP3333512 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]EP3339770 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,2,9,10 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] * * figures 2-3,5-8,9A,9B * |