EP4043407 - WATER TREATMENT SYSTEM, WATER TREATMENT METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metawater Co., Ltd. 1-25, Kanda-Sudacho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0041 / JP | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKA Daisuke c/o METAWATER Co., Ltd., 1-25, Kanda-Sudacho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0041 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI Hiroyuki c/o METAWATER Co., Ltd., 1-25, Kanda-Sudacho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0041 / JP | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Scott, Stephen John YUJA IP LAW 4 Centenary House The Avenue York YO30 6AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/33] | Scott, Stephen John YUJA Limited Suite 4, Level 6 Broad Gate 22-26 The Headrow Leeds LS1 8EQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20874824.4 | 10.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020JP34373 | Priority number, date | JP20190184810 | 07.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019184810 | [2022/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021070552 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4043407 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12, C02F3/34 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
C02F3/006 (EP,US);
C02F3/20 (US);
C02F2209/03 (EP,US);
C02F2209/14 (EP);
C02F2209/15 (EP);
C02F2209/38 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | WASSERBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM, WASSERBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2022/33] | English: | WATER TREATMENT SYSTEM, WATER TREATMENT METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2022/33] | French: | SYSTÈME, DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DES EAUX | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2022 | Translation filed | 06.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 18.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2018179476 (METAWATER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 7 * figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 1-6; | [XI]EP3524576 (MIURA KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 7 * abstract *[I] 1-6 | International search | [Y]JPS5799385 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1-7 * , claims, page 1, lower right column, line 1 to page 3, lower right column, line 3, fig. 1-3 *; | [A]JP2004223499 (YAMAMOTO TAKESHI) [A] 1-7 * , claims, paragraphs [0010]-[0016], [0028]-[0050], fig. 1 *; | [A]JP2005199115 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-7 * , claims, paragraphs [0028]-[0076], fig. 1-14 *; | [Y]JP2017127813 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-7 * , claims, paragraphs [0010]-[0124], fig. 1-16 *; | [A]JP2018202371 (KUBOTA KK) [A] 1-7* , claims, paragraphs [0013]-[0015], [0032]-[0054], fig. 1-5 * |