EP4042979 - ARTIFICIAL KNEE, AND BRIDGE MEMBER, INSERT MEMBER AND BASE PLATE USED THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Ehime University 10-13, Dogo-Himata Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 7908577 / JP | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINO, Kazunori Toon-shi, Ehime 7910295 / JP | 02 /
MIURA, Hiromasa Toon-shi, Ehime 7910295 / JP | 03 /
WATAMORI, Kunihiko Toon-shi, Ehime 7910295 / JP | 04 /
SHIRAISHI, Yoshitaka Toon-shi, Ehime 7910295 / JP | 05 /
KINOSHITA, Tomofumi Toon-shi, Ehime 7910295 / JP | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20874944.0 | 08.10.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020JP38120 | Priority number, date | JP20190186944 | 10.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019186944 | [2022/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021070904 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4042979 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/38 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
A61F2/389 (EP,US);
A61F2/3877 (CN);
A61F2/30749 (US);
A61F2/30756 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (EP);
A61F2/3836 (CN);
A61F2002/30113 (EP);
A61F2002/30115 (EP);
A61F2002/30116 (US);
A61F2002/30125 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30156 (US);
A61F2002/30187 (EP);
A61F2002/30225 (US);
A61F2002/30235 (US);
A61F2002/30841 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30845 (EP);
A61F2002/3085 (EP);
A61F2002/30884 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | KÜNSTLICHES KNIEGELENK, BRÜCKENGLIED, EINSATZELEMENT UND GRUNDPLATTE DAFÜR | [2022/33] | English: | ARTIFICIAL KNEE, AND BRIDGE MEMBER, INSERT MEMBER AND BASE PLATE USED THEREIN | [2022/33] | French: | GENOU ARTIFICIEL ET ÉLÉMENT DE PONT, ÉLÉMENT D'INSERT ET PLAQUE DE BASE UTILISÉS DANS CELUI-CI | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2022 | Translation filed | 26.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 03.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5344458 (BONUTTI PETER M [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,10,12 * column 6, line 37 - column 7, line 41 * * column 10, line 17 - line 44 * * figures 9-11,18-20 *; | [XY]US6620199 (GRELSAMER RONALD P [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7,8,10,12,13 * column 2, line 11 - line 31 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 5,6,9; | [Y]EP1426013 (ARTHROSURFACE INC [US]) [Y] 5,6,9 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * claim 5 ** figures 8-10 *; | [X]WO2019007290 (ZHU HONGWEN [CN]) [X] 1,2,10-12 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0085] * * figures 1,4-7,9 * | International search | [XYA]US5092895 (ALBREKTSSON BJOERN [SE], et al) [X] 1-2, 5, 10-17, 19-20 * column 9, line 15 to column 11, line 34, fig. 9-15 column 9, line 15 to column 11, line 34, fig. 9-15 * [Y] 4, 6-7, 18, 21-23 [A] 3, 8-9; | [Y]JPH05208029 (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 23* paragraph [0023], fig. 9-10 *; | [Y]US2002068979 (BROWN DAVID RAY [US], et al) [Y] 6-7, 21-22 * paragraphs [0036]-[0037], fig. 3-6 *; | [Y]JP2006518615 (ARTHROSURFACE, INCORPORATED) [Y] 21-22 * paragraph [0110], fig. 63A *; | [Y]JP2018502651 (ACTIVE IMPLANTS LLC) [Y] 4, 18 * paragraph [0038], fig. 4 * | by applicant | JP2001120583 | JP2013172992 | JP2018502651 |