EP3985391 - MAGNETIC PARTICLE LIGHT-EMITTING DOUBLE-LAYER MICRO-FLUIDIC CHIP AND DETECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Watmind Medical Co., Ltd. 8th Floor, Building A, No.16-1, Jinhui Road Jinsha Community, Kengzi Subdistrict Pingshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Dong 8th Floor Building A, No.16-1, Jinhui Road, Jinsha Community, Kengzi Subdistrict, Pingshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
FAN, Yuxia 8th Floor Building A, No.16-1, Jinhui Road, Jinsha Community, Kengzi Subdistrict, Pingshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 03 /
LI, Quan 8th Floor Building A, No.16-1, Jinhui Road, Jinsha Community, Kengzi Subdistrict, Pingshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 20875406.9 | 10.10.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020CN120091 | Priority number, date | CN201910962678 | 11.10.2019 Original published format: CN201910962678 | [2022/16] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021068914 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3985391 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/533, G01N33/543 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
G01N33/54386 (EP,US);
G01N33/533 (CN);
G01N33/54326 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDER DOPPELSCHICHTIGER MIKROFLUIDISCHER CHIP MIT MAGNETISCHEN PARTIKELN UND DETEKTIONSSYSTEM | [2022/16] | English: | MAGNETIC PARTICLE LIGHT-EMITTING DOUBLE-LAYER MICRO-FLUIDIC CHIP AND DETECTION SYSTEM | [2022/16] | French: | PUCE MICROFLUIDIQUE À DOUBLE COUCHE ÉMETTRICE DE LUMIÈRE À PARTICULES MAGNÉTIQUES ET SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2022 | Translation filed | 11.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 02.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/18] | 22.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN105233892 (SHENZHEN HUAMAIXINGWEI MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-15* figure 1 *; | [A]CN205650212U (SHENZHEN HUAMAI XINGWEI MEDICAL TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * |