Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
08.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
08.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
04.11.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
03.11.2023 | Change - classification | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
03.11.2023 | Change - classification | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
26.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.12.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
16.12.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
27.09.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.07.2022 | Change - representative | |
15.07.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
15.07.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
20.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.04.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.03.2022 | Change - representative | |
11.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.04.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.04.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |