Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4016662
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.07.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2023 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
10.07.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.02.2023 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
03.02.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
03.02.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
09.12.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] |
09.12.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] |
04.10.2022 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
04.10.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.09.2022 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.05.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
20.05.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.03.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.03.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
18.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.05.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
17.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.04.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|