Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022352591 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020KR09953 | 28.07.2020 | KR20190124812 | 08.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7472270B | Global Dossier | 22.04.2024 | B2 | JP2022545267 | 26.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020KR09953 | 28.07.2020 | KR20190124812 | 08.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114342167B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2024 | B | CN114342167 | 12.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020KR09953 | 28.07.2020 | KR20190124812 | 08.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4016662 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2023 | A4 | EP4016662 | 22.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020KR09953 | 28.07.2020 | KR20190124812 | 08.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021071071 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20190124812 | 08.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210041950 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20190124812 | 08.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202020005976U | 28.11.2023 | U1 | Priority number | Date | KR20190124812 | 08.10.2019 |