EP4045235 - TOOL SET WITH INTERSPERSED DUAL STANDARD ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Langlotz, Bennet K. P.O. Box 660675 37585 Dallas, TX 75266-0675 / US | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 20875671.8 | 22.01.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020US14583 | Priority number, date | US201962915694P | 16.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962915694 P | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021076172 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4045235 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B25H3/00, B25H3/04, B65D85/24, B25B15/00, G09F3/02, B25B13/56 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
B25H3/003 (EP);
B25B13/56 (EP);
B25H3/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | B25H3/00, B25H3/04, B65D85/24, B25B15/00, G09F3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | WERKZEUGSATZ MIT EINGEFÜGTEN DOPPELTEN STANDARDELEMENTEN | [2022/34] | English: | TOOL SET WITH INTERSPERSED DUAL STANDARD ELEMENTS | [2022/34] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'OUTILS AVEC DOUBLES ÉLÉMENTS STANDARD INTERCALÉS | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6082227 (VOGEL ARTHUR C [US]) [Y] 2-4 * column 2, line 52 - line 56; figure 1 *; | [XY]US2005077198 (WIKLE DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0015]; figure 2 * [Y] 2-6,9-15; | [X]US2011000025 (JOHNSON RONALD L [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 45] , [0 46] , [0 60]; figure 8A *; | [Y]US2017036341 (JOHNSON RONALD L [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,9-15* paragraphs [0009] , [0 24] , [0 31] , [0 32]; figures 3, 4 * | International search | [A]US4936170 (ZUMETA ROBERTO G [US]) [A] 1-6, 9-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US5791211 (BONDHUS JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 9-20 * , entire document *; | [Y]US6082227 (VOGEL ARTHUR C [US]) [Y] 2-4 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1; col 2, In 18-31; col 2, In 57-62; col 2, In 33-40; col 3, In 36-40; col 3, In 50-63; *; | [A]US2001039860 (JOHNSON KENNETH R [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 9-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2006042428 (CHUANG LOUIS [TW]) [A] 1-6, 9-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2008276765 (JOHNSON RONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 9-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US8783138 (JOHNSON ROBYN MARIE [US]) [A] 1-6, 9-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2015013506 (JOHNSON RONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 9-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2016158930 (JOHNSON RONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 9-20 * , entire document *; | [XY]US2017036341 (JOHNSON RONALD L [US], et al) [X] 1, 5-6, 9-20 * , entire document, especially Fig. 3B, 4A, 4B, 4C, 4D, 4E; para[0031]; para[0009]; para[0032]; para[0024]; * [Y] 2-4; | [A]US2017144293 (JOHNSON RONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1-6,9-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2018207789 (OU YU-HUA [TW]) [A] 1-6,9-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2019168377 (JOHNSON RONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 9-20 * , entire document *; | [XT]US2020030947 (LANGLOTZ BENNET KARL [US]) [XT] 1-6, 9-20* , entire document * |