EP4047979 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SENDING SYSTEM PERFORMANCE PARAMETERS, MANAGEMENT DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Weihong ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
NI, Hua ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Aipex B.V. Vestdijk 51 5611 CA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2022/34] | Aipex B.V. P.O. Box 30223 3001 DE Rotterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 20875734.4 | 28.09.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020CN118336 | Priority number, date | CN201910974404 | 14.10.2019 Original published format: CN201910974404 | [2022/34] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021073413 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4047979 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L43/08, H04L43/06, H04W24/08, // H04L43/0888, H04L41/14 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
H04L43/06 (EP,US);
H04L41/5009 (KR,US);
H04W24/08 (CN,KR);
H04W28/24 (US);
H04L43/08 (EP);
H04L43/0888 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | H04W24/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN VON SYSTEMLEISTUNGSPARAMETERN, VERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/34] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SENDING SYSTEM PERFORMANCE PARAMETERS, MANAGEMENT DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ENVOI DE PARAMÈTRES DE PERFORMANCE DE SYSTÈME, DISPOSITIF DE GESTION ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2022 | Translation filed | 13.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 06.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2611074 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]); | [A]EP2611084 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]); | [XI]US2014120930 (HARRIS JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US2015095117 (HARIHARAN RAJARAMAN [CA], et al) |