EP4046540 - SPRING CUSHION FOR FURNITURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/34] | ELASTIC PAD FOR FURNITURE | ||
[2024/32] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New-Tec Integration (Xiamen) Co., Ltd. No. 88 Zhennan 3rd Road Tongji Industrial Zone Tong'an District Xiamen, Fujian 361100 / CN | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LENG, Luhao 577-1, Huangcuo Road, Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361005 / CN | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/34] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20875766.6 | 16.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020CN121407 | Priority number, date | CN201910990436 | 17.10.2019 Original published format: CN201910990436 | CN202011105910 | 15.10.2020 Original published format: CN202011105910 | [2022/34] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021073597 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4046540 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47C27/05, A47C27/14, A47C31/10, A47C27/06, A47C23/30, A47C23/00, A47C23/043, A47C23/05, A47C27/07 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
A47C23/002 (EP,US);
A47C27/06 (KR);
A47C27/053 (EP,CN,US);
A47C27/063 (EP,GB,US);
A47C27/07 (EP,US);
A47C23/005 (EP,KR);
A47C23/0438 (EP,GB,US);
A47C23/05 (EP);
A47C23/057 (KR,US);
A47C23/30 (EP);
A47C27/056 (US);
A47C27/064 (US);
A47C27/065 (EP,US);
A47C27/14 (EP,CN);
A47C27/15 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | A47C27/05, A47C27/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | FEDERKISSEN FÜR MÖBEL | [2024/32] | English: | SPRING CUSHION FOR FURNITURE | [2024/32] | French: | COUSSIN À RESSORTS POUR MEUBLES | [2024/32] |
Former [2022/34] | ELASTISCHES POLSTER FÜR MÖBEL | ||
Former [2022/34] | ELASTIC PAD FOR FURNITURE | ||
Former [2022/34] | COUSSINET ÉLASTIQUE POUR AMEUBLEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2022 | Translation filed | 19.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 14.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1544416 (SUEKOFF LOUIS A); | [A]US1898491 (THOMAS KYLE WILLIAM); | [A]US3160894 (FREY LOUIS E) |