EP4033826 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RESELECTING SIDELINK RESOURCES IN NR V2X [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Seungmin IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
SEO, Hanbyul IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2024/23] |
Former [2022/30] | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20876246.8 | 19.10.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020KR14266 | Priority number, date | US201962916255P | 17.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962916255 P | [2022/30] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021075938 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4033826 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4033826 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, H04W72/12, H04W4/40, H04W92/18 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP,KR);
H04W72/25 (US);
H04B17/328 (US);
H04W4/40 (KR);
H04W72/121 (KR);
H04W72/20 (KR);
H04W72/542 (KR);
H04W72/56 (KR);
H04W72/566 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/30] | H04W72/02, H04W72/10, H04W72/12, H04W4/40, H04W92/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR NEUAUSWAHL VON SIDELINK-RESSOURCEN IN NR V2X | [2022/30] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RESELECTING SIDELINK RESOURCES IN NR V2X | [2022/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RESÉLECTION DE RESSOURCE DE LIAISON LATÉRALE EN V2X NR | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2022 | Translation filed | 22.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 04.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2019306835 (HOANG TUONG DUC [CA], et al); | International search | [A]WO2019185830 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | Examination | CN110268767 | US2019349952 |