EP4047287 - REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIYAMA, Takumi c/o MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
MURATA, Kenta c/o MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 20876645.1 | 03.04.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020JP15260 | Priority number, date | WO2019JP41225 | 18.10.2019 Original published format: PCT/JP2019/041225 | [2022/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021075075 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4047287 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/00, C09K5/04, F25B9/00 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
F25B1/00 (EP);
F25B9/006 (US);
C09K5/045 (EP,US);
F25B9/002 (EP);
C09K2205/106 (EP,US);
C09K2205/126 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | F25B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | KÄLTEKREISLAUFVORRICHTUNG | [2022/34] | English: | REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE | [2022/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF À CYCLE DE RÉFRIGÉRATION | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2022 | Translation filed | 13.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 24.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP3101082 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [XYI]EP3511392 (AGC INC [JP]) | International search | [Y]JP2001050685 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JP2005015633 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2009024152 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [Y]WO2015115252 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO2015125884 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]JP2018040517 (HITACHI JOHNSON CONTROLS AIR CONDITIONING INC); | [Y]JP2018104565 (PANASONIC CORP); | [Y]JP2019504175 ; | [Y]JP2019512031 ; | [PY]JP2019214720 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [PA]JP2020002380 (DAIKIN IND LTD) | by applicant | JP2004198063 | JP2015034296 |