EP4027769 - ELECTRIC VEHICLE WITH MULTIPLE PORTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 18.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Briggs & Stratton, LLC 12301 West Wirth Street Wauwatosa, Wisconsin 53222 / US | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZEILER, Jeffrey c/o Briggs & Stratton Corporation 12301 West Wirth Street Wauwatosa, Wisconsin 53222 / US | 02 /
FUNKE, Scott c/o Briggs & Stratton, LLC 12301 West Wirth Street Wauwatosa, Wisconsin 53222 / US | 03 /
NOLLER, Mark c/o Briggs & Stratton Corporation 12301 West Wirth Street Wauwatosa, Wisconsin 53222 / US | 04 /
CORRADO, Warren c/o Briggs & Stratton, LLC 12301 West Wirth Street Wauwatosa, Wisconsin 53222 / US | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 20876983.6 | 14.10.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020US55594 | Priority number, date | US201962915558P | 15.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962915558 P | US202062983456P | 28.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062983456 P | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021076635 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4027769 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/78, B60L53/16, A01D34/00, B60K1/04, B60K1/00, B60K7/00 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
B60K1/00 (EP);
A01D34/78 (EP,US);
A01D69/02 (US);
B60K1/04 (US);
B60K7/0007 (EP,US);
B60L53/16 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/29] | A01D34/00, A01D34/78, B60K1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES FAHRZEUG MIT MEHREREN ANSCHLÜSSEN | [2022/29] | English: | ELECTRIC VEHICLE WITH MULTIPLE PORTS | [2022/29] | French: | VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE À PORTS MULTIPLES | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 18.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014058608 (WYATT CHRISTOPHER K [US], et al); | [I]US2019075724 (BECKE PAUL [US], et al); | [A]US2019291779 (ZEILER JEFFREY [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US2010178797 (BYRNE NORMAN R [US]) [Y] 11 * , para [0141], [0162] *; | [Y]US2010292877 (LEE PAUL ZI FANG [US]) [Y] 4 * , para [0039], [0061], [0094] *; | [Y]US2013320911 (KAMIYA KEI [JP], et al) [Y] 8 * , para [0028], [0101]-[0102] *; | [A]US2013328522 (BROCKMAN DARYL C [US], et al) [A] 14 * , para [0018] *; | [Y]US2014246902 (FINK MICHAEL [DE]) [Y] 3 * , para [0013], [0032] *; | [Y]US2018285229 (TRUONG BINH T [US], et al) [Y] 15 * , para [0010], [0016] *; | [XYA]US2019291779 (ZEILER JEFFREY [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 5-7, 9, 10, 12, 13, 16-20 * , para [0003], [0004], [0021]-[0023], [0040], [0043], [0045], [0046], [0051], [0062], [0081], [0084], [0094] * [Y] 3, 4, 8, 11, 15 [A] 14; | [PY]WO2020077176 (BRIGGS & STRATTON CORP [US]) [PY] 1-20* , para [0047], [0056], [0062], [0072] * | by applicant | US2019075724 | US19370078067 |