EP4047951 - STEREO SOUND BOX AND STEREO SOUND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TGI Technology Pte Ltd 62 Marine Parade Road No. 09-05 Cote D'Azur Singapore 449298 / SG | For all designated states Li, Shihuang 62 Marine Parade Road Cote d'Azure 09-05 Singapore 449298 / SG | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Shihuang 62 Marine Parade Road 09-05 Cote D'Azur Singapore 449298 / SG | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/34] | Weickmann, Hans Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20877231.9 | 11.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020SG50581 | Priority number, date | CN201910977881 | 15.10.2019 Original published format: CN201910977881 | [2022/34] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021076051 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4047951 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04R5/02, H04R3/12, H04S1/00 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
H04R5/02 (EP,CN,US);
H04R1/2819 (EP,US);
H04R1/02 (EP);
H04R1/025 (US);
H04R1/24 (US);
H04R1/26 (EP);
H04R1/2826 (US);
H04R5/04 (US);
H04S1/007 (US);
H04R2420/07 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | STEREORESONANZKÖRPER UND STEREOTONSYSTEM | [2022/34] | English: | STEREO SOUND BOX AND STEREO SOUND SYSTEM | [2022/34] | French: | BOÎTIER ACOUSTIQUE STÉRÉO ET SYSTÈME ACOUSTIQUE STÉRÉO | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2022 | Translation filed | 11.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 25.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3393764 (SCHAFER CURTISS R); | [A]USD466887S (LEWIS DAVID [DK]); | [XI]KR20060116159 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [XI]JP2010081441 (BIFRISTEC KK) | International search | [X]US6625289 (OLIEMULLER ROBERT J [NL]); | [A]CN101031164 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]); | [A]CN201156812Y (WENGE YAN [CN]); | [A]CN102196334 (LOGITECH EUROP SA); | [A]CN102655614 (GUANGZHOU HIVI ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE CO LTD); | [X]US2017289492 (TIAN XIAOSHENG [CN]); | [A]US2017359653 (BARONE FRANK [US], et al); | [X]CN209358769U (JIAXING DIBEISI ELECTROACOUSTIC CO LTD) |