EP4044907 - AUTOMATIC PRESSURE ULCER MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United States Government as Represented by The Department of Veterans Affairs 810 Vermont Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20420 / US | For all designated states University of South Florida 3820 USF Alumni Dr., Rm. ENB 345 Tampa, FL 33620 / US | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETERSON, Matthew, J. c/o James A. Haley Veterans Hospital Research Service, 673-151R 8900 Grand Oak Cir. Tampa, FL 33637 / US | 02 /
COWAN, Linda, J. c/o James A. Haley Veterans Hospital Research Service, 673-151R 8900 Grand Oak Cir. Tampa, FL 33637 / US | 03 /
HALL, Kimberly, S. c/o James A. Haley Veterans Hospital Research Service, 673-151R 8900 Grand Oak Cir. Tampa, FL 33637 / US | 04 /
GOLDGOF, Dmitry c/o University of South Florida Department of Computer Science and Engineering 3820 USF Alumni Dr., Rm. ENB 326 Tampa, FL 33620 / US | 05 /
SARKAR, Sudeep c/o University of South Florida Department of Computer Science and Engineering 3820 USF Alumni Dr., Rm. ENB 345 Tampa, FL 33620 / US | 06 /
PAI, Chih-Yun c/o University of South Florida Department of Computer Science and Engineering 3820 USF Alumni Dr., Rm. ENB 345 Tampa, FL 33620 / US | 07 /
MORERA, Hunter c/o University of South Florida Department of Computer Science and Engineering 3820 USF Alumni Dr., Rm. ENB 345 Tampa, FL 33620 / US | 08 /
SUN, Yu c/o University of South Florida Department of Computer Science and Engineering 3820 USF Alumni Dr., Rm. ENB 345 Tampa, FL 33620 / US | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 20877507.2 | 14.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020US55583 | Priority number, date | US201962914832P | 14.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962914832 P | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021076628 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4044907 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/12, G06T7/11, G06T7/62, G06T7/174, A61B5/00, G06T7/40 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
G06T7/12 (EP,US);
G06T7/62 (EP,US);
A61B5/0077 (EP,US);
A61B5/445 (EP);
A61B5/4842 (EP);
A61B5/6844 (EP);
A61B5/6898 (EP);
A61B5/7267 (EP);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06T7/11 (EP);
G06T7/174 (EP);
G06T7/90 (US);
A61B2576/00 (EP);
A61B5/0022 (EP);
G06T2200/04 (US);
G06T2200/24 (EP);
G06T2207/10024 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10028 (EP);
G06T2207/20021 (US);
G06T2207/20081 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30088 (EP);
G06T2207/30096 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | A61B5/00, G06T7/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE MESSUNG VON DEKUBITALULZERA | [2022/34] | English: | AUTOMATIC PRESSURE ULCER MEASUREMENT | [2022/34] | French: | MESURE D'ULCÈRE DE PRESSION AUTOMATISÉE | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 06.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PAI C-Y ET AL, "Automatic pressure ulcer measurement using RGB-D data", PROGRESS IN BIOMEDICAL OPTICS AND IMAGING, SPIE - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, BELLINGHAM, WA, US, (20190315), vol. 10953, doi:10.1117/12.2512535, ISSN 1605-7422, ISBN 978-1-5106-0027-0, pages 1095320 - 1095320, XP060120119 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2512535 | International search | [Y]US2015119721 (PEDERSEN PEDER C [US], et al) [Y] 8-14 * , entire document, especially Abstract; para [0100]-[0132], [0147] *; | [A]US2018357763 (PEDERSEN PEDER C [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2019053750 (CHANDRAKASAN ANANTHA P [US], et al) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [XY] - PAI C-Y; Morera H; Sarkar S; Hall K; Cowan L; Toyinbo P A; Peterson M J; Goldgof D, "Automatic pressure ulcer measurement using RGB-D data", Proc. SPIE 10953, . Medical Imaging 2019: Biomedical Applications in Molecular, Structural, and Functional Imaging, vol. 1095320, doi:10.1117/12.2512535, (20190315), URL: https://doi.org/10.1117/12.2512535, (20201214), XP060120119 [X] 1-7, 15-20 * , entire document, especially Abstract; page 2-4 * [Y] 8-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2512535 |