EP4045685 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR MEASURING CELL STATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 13.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Washington University One Brookings Drive St. Louis, Missouri 63130 / US | For all designated states The Board and Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University The Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Main Quad Stanford, CA 94305 / US | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAUDHURI, Aadel c/o Washington University One Brookings Drive St. Louis, Missouri 63130 / US | 02 /
NEWMAN, Aaron c/o Stanford University OFFICE OF THE GENERAL COUNSEL BUILDING 170, 3RD FLOOR, MAIN QUAD Stanford, California 94305 / US | 03 /
ALAHI, Irfan c/o Washington University One Brookings Drive St. Louis, Missouri 63130 / US | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/34] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 20877527.0 | 18.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020US56218 | Priority number, date | US201962916961P | 18.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962916961 P | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021077063 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4045685 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6881, C12Q1/6883, C12Q1/6886, C40B40/06 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP);
C12Q1/6881 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
C40B40/06 (EP);
C12Q2600/154 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR MESSUNG VON ZELLZUSTÄNDEN | [2022/34] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR MEASURING CELL STATES | [2022/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR MESURER DES ÉTATS CELLULAIRES | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 10.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2017201400 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0043]; claim 1 * * paragraph [0134] * * paragraph [0081] *; | [XY]WO2018119216 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 13-15 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052]; claims 1,6,16,20 * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0091] * [Y] 1-12; | [Y]EP3382033 (RWTH AACHEN [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2019018684 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0134] *; | [Y] - GUO SHICHENG ET AL, "Identification of methylation haplotype blocks aids in deconvolution of heterogeneous tissue samples and tumor tissue-of-origin mapping from plasma DNA", NATURE GENETICS, New York, vol. 49, no. 4, doi:10.1038/ng.3805, ISSN 1061-4036, (20170306), pages 635 - 642, URL: http://www.nature.com/articles/ng.3805, XP093043427 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng.3805 | [Y] - CANDACE C LIU ET AL, "Computational approaches for characterizing the tumor immune microenvironment", CANCER RESEARCH, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (20190912), vol. 158, no. 2, doi:10.1111/IMM.13101, ISSN 0019-2805, pages 70 - 84, XP071277571 [Y] 13-15 * page 8; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/imm.13101 | [A] - HOVESTADT VOLKER ET AL, "Resolving medulloblastoma cellular architecture by single-cell genomics", CLEO: APPLICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY 2019 SAN JOSE, CALIFORNIA UNITED STATES 5-10 MAY 2019, OPTICA, (20190724), vol. 572, no. 7767, doi:10.1038/S41586-019-1434-6, pages 74 - 79, XP036848578 [A] 1-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41586-019-1434-6 | International search | [Y]US2013260378 (OLEK SVEN [DE], et al) [Y] 13, 16, 17 * entire document *; | [Y]US2016217253 (NEWMAN AARON M [US], et al) [Y] 15, 20 * entire document *; | [XY]US2017029900 (LO YUK-MING DENNIS [CN], et al) [X] 1-12, 14, 18, 19, 22, 23 * entire document * [Y] 13, 15-17, 20, 21, 24-37; | [X]WO2018119216 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 38-40, 48-50, 56-58,66-68, 74-77 * entire document *; | [Y] - Boomer Jonathan S, Green Jonathan M, Hotchkiss Richard S, "The changing immune system in sepsis: is individualized immuno-modulatory therapy the answer?", Virulence, (20140100), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 45 - 56, XP055816514 [Y] 21,24-37 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/viru.26516 | [Y] - DWIVEDI et al., "Prognostic utility and characterization of cell -free DNA in patients with severe sepsis", Crit Care, (20120813), vol. 16, no. 4, doi:10.1186/cc11466, pages 1 - 11, XP021108516 [Y] 30, 31 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/cc11466 | [Y] - Rahman Najib M, Phil D, Maskell Nicholas A, D M, West Alex, M R C P, Teoh Richard, M R C P, Arnold Anthony, M R C P, Mackinlay Carolyn, M R C P, Peckham Daniel, M D, Davies Chris W H, M D, Ali Nabeel, M D, Kinnear William, M D, Bentley Andrew, M D, Kahan Brennan C, Sc M, Wrightson John M, M R C P, Davies Helen E, M R C P, Hooper Clare E, M R C P, Lee Y C Gary, Ph D, Hedley Emma L, Crosthwaite Nicky, R G N, Choo Louise, Helm Emma J, F R C R, Gleeson Fergus V, M D, Nunn Andrew J, Davies Robert J O, M D, "Intrapleural use of tissue plasminogen activator and DNase in pleural infection", The New England Journal of Medicine, (20110811), vol. 365, no. 6, pages 518 - 526, XP055816517 [Y] 32-35 * . entire document * | [A] - SEHOULI et al., "Epigenetic quantification of tumor-infiltrating T-lymphocytes", Epigenetics, (20110201), vol. 6, no. 2, doi:10.4161/epi.6.2.13755, pages 236 - 246, XP002639447 [A] 1-40, 48-50, 56-58,66-68, 74-77 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/epi.6.2.13755 |