EP3922762 - CRYSTAL GROWTH METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEISHAN BOYA ADVANCED MATERIALS CO., LTD. No. 3, Junle Road Jinxiang Chemical Industrial Park Dongpo District Meishan, Sichuan 620010 / CN | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yu No 3, Junle Road Jinxiang Chemical Industrial Park Dongpo District, Meishan, Sichuan 620010 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Tian No 3, Junle Road Jinxiang Chemical Industrial Park Dongpo District, Meishan, Sichuan 620010 / CN | 03 /
LIANG, Zhenxing No 3, Junle Road Jinxiang Chemical Industrial Park Dongpo District, Meishan, Sichuan 620010 / CN | 04 /
LI, Min No 3, Junle Road Jinxiang Chemical Industrial Park Dongpo District, Meishan, Sichuan 620010 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
WANG, Yu Dongpo District, Meishan, Sichuan 620010 / CN | ||
02 /
YANG, Tian Dongpo District, Meishan, Sichuan 620010 / CN | |||
03 /
LIANG, Zhenxing Dongpo District, Meishan, Sichuan 620010 / CN | |||
04 /
LI, Min Dongpo District, Meishan, Sichuan 620010 / CN | Representative(s) | Wang, Bo Panovision IP Ebersberger Straße 3 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20878022.1 | 14.04.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020CN84583 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021207904 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3922762 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/36, C30B23/00, C30B29/48, C30B29/40, C30B35/00, C30B29/16, C30B23/06 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
C30B23/005 (EP,US);
C30B23/00 (CN);
C30B23/002 (EP,CN);
C30B23/066 (US);
C30B29/16 (US);
C30B29/36 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/50] | C30B29/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR KRISTALLZUCHT | [2021/50] | English: | CRYSTAL GROWTH METHOD AND DEVICE | [2021/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CROISSANCE DE CRISTAL | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2021 | Translation filed | 26.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 24.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH05306199 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); | [Y]CN102021653B (BEIJING HUAJIN CHUANGWEI ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [XYI]JP2015040146 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [XYI]CN107955969 (HEBEI TONGGUANG CRYSTAL CO LTD); | [XYI]CN108374197 (UNIV XIAN TECHNOLOGY); | [Y]CN109576783 (UNIV SHANDONG); | [Y]CN110983443 (HARBIN SOFT IMPACT CHINA CO LTD) | International search | [Y]US2012086001 (WANG SHAOPING [US]); | [Y]CN102618930 (HARBIN INST OF TECHNOLOGY); | [A]CN106191998 (SHANGHAI INST CERAMICS CAS); | [A]CN106801258 (SHANGHAI INST CERAMICS CAS); | [Y]CN107904657 (HARBIN AURORA OPTOELECTRONICS TECH CO LTD); | [XY]CN107955969 (HEBEI TONGGUANG CRYSTAL CO LTD); | [XY]CN108374197 (UNIV XIAN TECHNOLOGY) |