EP4050197 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJII, Hiroshi 650-8670 Hyogo / JP | 02 /
FUJII, Takafumi 650-8670 Hyogo / JP | 03 /
OKUWA, Tatsuya 650-8670 Hyogo / JP | 04 /
MAESATO, Hikaru 650-8670 Hyogo / JP | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20878505.5 | 20.10.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020JP39455 | Priority number, date | JP20190191929 | 21.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019191929 | [2022/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021079891 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4050197 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/06, F01D25/00, F01D25/16, F01D25/18, F16N7/32, F02C6/08, F02C6/06 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
F02C7/06 (EP,US);
F01D25/16 (US);
F01D25/18 (US);
F01D25/20 (EP);
F02C6/08 (EP);
F16N7/32 (EP);
F05D2220/323 (US);
F05D2240/50 (US);
F05D2260/601 (EP);
F05D2260/98 (EP,US);
F16N2210/02 (EP);
F16N2210/14 (EP);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | F02C7/06, F01D25/16, F01D25/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | GASTURBINENTRIEBWERK | [2022/35] | English: | GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2022/35] | French: | MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2022 | Translation filed | 19.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 03.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4717000 (WADDINGTON CLIVE [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 64 ** abstract *; | [A]US5018601 (WADDINGTON CLIVE [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 22 - column 5, line 18 * * column 8, line 10 - line 48 * * abstract *; | [AD]JP2001165390 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [AD] 1-5 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2013083159 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-5; | [A]JP2014163236 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-5* 0028-0030, 0034, 3 * | by applicant | JP2001165390 |