EP4050877 - DETACHABLE/REPLACEABLE GIMBAL CAMERA, AERIAL VEHICLE, SYSTEM, AND GIMBAL DETACHMENT/REPLACEMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autel Robotics Co., Ltd. 9th Floor, Building B1 Zhiyuan No.1001, Xueyuan Road Xili Street, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518055 / CN | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Zhaozao 9th Floor, Building B1, Zhiyuan, No. 1001, Xueyuan Road, Xili Street, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518055 / CN | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20878602.0 | 23.10.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020CN123319 | Priority number, date | CN20191118698 | 24.10.2019 Original published format: CN201911018698 | [2022/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021078270 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4050877 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, H04N5/232, H04N5/907, B64C27/08, B64D47/08 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
B64D47/08 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/55 (CN,US);
H04N23/54 (CN,US);
B64U10/14 (EP,CN,US);
B64U2101/30 (EP,CN,US);
G02B13/14 (US);
G03B15/006 (EP,US);
G03B17/561 (EP,US);
H04N17/002 (EP);
H04N23/617 (EP);
H04N23/66 (EP,US);
H04N23/67 (CN,US);
H04N23/695 (CN);
H04N5/77 (EP,US);
H04N5/907 (EP,CN,US);
H04N7/015 (US);
H04N7/183 (US);
H04N7/185 (EP);
H04N23/663 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | ABNEHMBARE/AUSWECHSELBARE KARDANISCHE KAMERA, LUFTFAHRZEUG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABNEHMEN/AUSWECHSELN DES KARDANISCHEN SYSTEMS | [2022/35] | English: | DETACHABLE/REPLACEABLE GIMBAL CAMERA, AERIAL VEHICLE, SYSTEM, AND GIMBAL DETACHMENT/REPLACEMENT METHOD | [2022/35] | French: | CAMÉRA À NACELLE DÉTACHABLE/REMPLAÇABLE, VÉHICULE AÉRIEN, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTACHEMENT/REMPLACEMENT DE NACELLE | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2022 | Translation filed | 24.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 31.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018274720 (GUBLER THOMAS [CH], et al); | [XI]WO2019000842 (SZ DJI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]); | US2020137310 [ ] (ZHANG JIAYI [CN], et al) |