EP4049879 - MULTI-MODULE INTELLIGENT DRIVING SYSTEM FOR HIGH/MIDDLE-POWER ELECTRIC VEHICLE, AND HIGH/MIDDLE-POWER ELECTRIC VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 06.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiangsu Juci Electrical Drive Technology Co., Ltd Technical Department/ BU, Yanzhu No. 9 Longpan Road, Anzhen Street, Xishan District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214104 / CN | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Wei BU Yanzhu/Technical Department No. 9 Longpan Road Anzhen Street, Xishan District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214104 / CN | 02 /
HUA, Wei Technical Department/ BU Yanzhu No. 9 Longpan Road, Anzhen Street, Xishan District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214104 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Jianhua Technical Department/ BU Yanzhu No. 9 Longpan Road, Anzhen Street, Xishan District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214104 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Qing Technical Department/ BU Yanzhu No.9 Longpan Road Anzhen Street, Xishan District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214104 / CN | 05 /
ZHOU, Wei Technical Department/ BU Yanzhu No.9 Longpan Road Anzhen Street, Xishan District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214104 / CN | 06 /
BU, Yanzhu Technical Department/ BU Yanzhu No.9 Longpan Road Anzhen Street, Xishan District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214104 / CN | 07 /
LI, Yugang Technical Department/ BU Yanzhu No.9 Longpan Road Anzhen Street, Xishan District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214104 / CN | 08 /
HU, Yibao Technical Department/ BU Yanzhu No.9 Longpan Road Anzhen Street, Xishan District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214104 / CN | 09 /
CHENG, Xing Technical Department/ BU Yanzhu No.9 Longpan Road Anzhen Street, Xishan District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214104 / CN | 10 /
LIU, Yajun Technical Department/ BU Yanzhu No.9 Longpan Road Anzhen Street, Xishan District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214104 / CN | 11 /
HU, Jinlong Technical Department/ BU Yanzhu No.9 Longpan Road Anzhen Street, Xishan District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214104 / CN | 12 /
LI, Sheng Technical Department/ BU Yanzhu No.9 Longpan Road Anzhen Street, Xishan District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214104 / CN | 13 /
ZHAO, Qichao Technical Department/ BU Yanzhu No.9 Longpan Road Anzhen Street, Xishan District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214104 / CN | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20878728.3 | 30.04.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020CN87937 | Priority number, date | CN20191112111 | 23.10.2019 Original published format: CN201911012111 | [2022/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021077707 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4049879 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60L3/00, B60L53/20, H02P25/18 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
B60L3/0046 (EP);
B60L3/0092 (EP,KR);
B60L3/00 (CN);
B60L15/20 (KR);
B60L3/003 (EP);
B60L3/0061 (EP);
B60L50/60 (EP);
B60L53/20 (CN);
B60L58/10 (EP);
B60L58/14 (EP);
B60L58/21 (EP);
B60R16/023 (KR);
H02P25/18 (CN,KR);
H02P25/22 (EP);
B60L2200/12 (KR);
B60L2220/10 (EP,KR);
B60L2220/42 (EP);
B60L2240/12 (EP,KR);
B60L2240/545 (EP,KR);
B60L2240/547 (EP,KR);
B60L2240/549 (EP,KR);
B60Y2200/12 (KR);
B60Y2200/91 (KR);
H02P2101/45 (EP);
Y02T10/64 (EP,KR);
Y02T10/70 (EP,KR);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | MEHRMODULIGES INTELLIGENTES FAHRSYSTEM FÜR ELEKTROFAHRZEUGE MIT HOHER/MITTLERER LEISTUNG UND ELEKTROFAHRZEUGE MIT HOHER/MITTLERER LEISTUNG | [2022/35] | English: | MULTI-MODULE INTELLIGENT DRIVING SYSTEM FOR HIGH/MIDDLE-POWER ELECTRIC VEHICLE, AND HIGH/MIDDLE-POWER ELECTRIC VEHICLE | [2022/35] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT INTELLIGENT À PLUSIEURS MODULES POUR VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE À HAUTE/MOYENNE PUISSANCE, ET VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE À HAUTE/MOYENNE PUISSANCE | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2022 | Translation filed | 29.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 03.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN101141070 (MAIWEI ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY S [CN]) [Y] 8 * claim 1 ** and corresponding text;; figure 1 *; | [A]US2017149101 (SAKABE KEI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0026] *; | [Y]CN107248757 (SF TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * claim 1 * * and corresponding text;; figure 2 * * and corresponding text;; figure 6 *; | [A]CN109245343 (WUXI SINE POWER TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * Technical field * * and corresponding text;; figure 1 * * and corresponding text;; figure 3 *; | [Y]CN110239350 (UNIV NANTONG) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0104] * * figure 14 * | International search | [Y]CN101141070 (MAIWEI ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY S [CN]) [Y] 1-10 * description, particular embodiments, and figure 2 *; | [A]CN202389228U (FENGCHEN DU, et al) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]KR20130045094 (HYUN DAI HEAVY IND CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [Y]CN107248757 (SF TECH CO LTD) [Y] 8 * description, specific embodiments, and figure 1 *; | [Y]CN109245343 (WUXI SINE POWER TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * description, paragraphs 7-78 and 104, and figure 14 *; | [PX]CN110843530 (WUXI SINE POWER TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-10 * | by applicant | CN20181194616 | CN20181194626 | CN20181194649 | CN20181197434 |