EP4049746 - DESALINATION PERFORMANCE RESTORING AGENT FOR CELLULOSE ACETATE MEMBRANE AND METHOD FOR RESTORING DESALINATION PERFORMANCE OF CELLULOSE ACETATE MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-Chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | For all designated states Kyoeisha Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-12, Minamihonmachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORI, Takayoshi c/o Mitsubishi Power, Ltd., 3-1, Minatomirai 3- Chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | 02 /
MATSUI, Katsunori c/o Mitsubishi Power, Ltd., 3-1, Minatomirai 3- Chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | 03 /
YOKOGAWA, Sho c/o Mitsubishi Power, Ltd., 3-1, Minatomirai 3- Chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | 04 /
ITO, Yoshiaki c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 2-3, Marunouchi 3-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | 05 /
KAMITO, Ryo c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 2-3, Marunouchi 3-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | 06 /
KATSUNISHI, Yoshihisa c/o Nara Laboratory of Kyoeisha Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-5, Saikujo-cho 5-chome Nara-shi, Nara 630-8453 / JP | 07 /
UEDA, Atsuyoshi c/o Nara Laboratory of Kyoeisha Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-5, Saikujo-cho 5-chome Nara-shi, Nara 630-8453 / JP | 08 /
MASUI, Takahiro c/o Nara Laboratory of Kyoeisha Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-5, Saikujo-cho 5-chome Nara-shi, Nara 630-8453 / JP | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20878758.0 | 20.10.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020JP39353 | Priority number, date | JP20190193701 | 24.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019193701 | [2022/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021079867 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4049746 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01D65/00, B01D67/00, B01D69/12, B01D71/16, B01D71/38 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
B01D65/108 (EP);
B01D65/06 (US);
B01D67/00 (US);
B01D69/12 (EP,US);
B01D71/16 (EP,US);
B01D71/381 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | ENTSALZUNGSLEISTUNGWIEDERHERSTELLUNGSMITTEL FÜR CELLULOSEACETATMEMBRAN UND VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERHERSTELLUNG DER ENTSALZUNGSLEISTUNG VON CELLULOSEACETATMEMBRAN | [2022/35] | English: | DESALINATION PERFORMANCE RESTORING AGENT FOR CELLULOSE ACETATE MEMBRANE AND METHOD FOR RESTORING DESALINATION PERFORMANCE OF CELLULOSE ACETATE MEMBRANE | [2022/35] | French: | AGENT DE RESTAURATION DE PERFORMANCE DE DESSALEMENT POUR MEMBRANE À BASE D'ACÉTATE DE CELLULOSE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RESTAURATION DE PERFORMANCE DE DESSALEMENT D'UNE MEMBRANE À BASE D'ACÉTATE DE CELLULOSE | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2022 | Translation filed | 03.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 09.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3877978 (KREMEN SEYMOUR S, et al); | [X]JPS6230509 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [X]WO2019138880 (KURITA WATER IND LTD [JP]) | International search | [A]JPS5232869B ; | [A]JP2014128760 (KURITA WATER IND LTD) | by applicant | JPS6251953B |