EP4048938 - PORTABLE LIGHTING DEVICE WITH RAMP-DOWN CAPABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 21.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation 13135 West Lisbon Road Brookfield, WI 53005-2550 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/35] | For all designated states Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation 13135 West Lisbon Road Brookfield WI 53005-2550 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUTA, Jonathan, J. 2927 N. Pierce Street Milwaukee, WI 53212 / US | 02 /
MCMURRAY, Gary, Lee N37 W26659 Kopmeier Drive Pewaukee, WI 53072 / US | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20878834.9 | 21.10.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020US56634 | Priority number, date | US201962923866P | 21.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962923866 P | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021081077 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4048938 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F21L4/00, F21V14/02, F21V23/00, H05B47/16, H05B47/17, H05B47/18 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
H05B45/10 (EP);
H05B45/12 (CN,US);
H05B47/11 (CN,US);
F21L4/005 (EP,US);
F21V33/0008 (US);
H05B47/16 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | F21L4/00, F21V14/02, F21V23/00, H05B47/16, H05B47/17 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | TRAGBARE BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT RAMP-DOWN-FÄHIGKEIT | [2022/35] | English: | PORTABLE LIGHTING DEVICE WITH RAMP-DOWN CAPABILITY | [2022/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE PORTATIF À CAPACITÉ D'ABAISSEMENT | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 21.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010084997 (OBERZEIR JOSEPH ANTHONY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 ** paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] *; | [XAI]US2015108896 (GORDIN MYRON [US]) [X] 1-4,6,9,12-14 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0064] * [A] 7,8,10,11 [I] 5,15 | International search | [Y]US2009323317 (SPARTANO DAVID A [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0025]; and figure 1 *; | [A]US2010084997 (OBERZEIR JOSEPH ANTHONY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0014]-[0019]; and figure 1 *; | [A]JP2011529249 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.) [A] 1-20 * the entire document *; | [A]US2012112667 (MOHAN TANUJ [US], et al) [A] 1-20* the entire document *; | [Y]US2018352630 (UENO SAORI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0054]-[0070]; and figures 4-5 * |