EP4048852 - DRILL BIT CUTTER ELEMENTS AND DRILL BITS INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 14.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Oilwell Varco, L.P. 7909 Parkwood Circle Drive Houston, TX 77036 / US | [2024/37] |
Former [2022/35] | For all designated states National Oilwell DHT, L.P. 7909 Parkwood Circle Drive Houston, TX 77036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOROZOV, Konstantin E. 70 Scarlet Mead Court The Woodlands, Texas 77384 / US | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20878964.4 | 24.09.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020US52540 | Priority number, date | US201962926177P | 25.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962926177 P | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021080728 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4048852 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | E21B10/567, E21B10/42, E21B10/26, E21B10/55, E21B10/56 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
E21B10/5673 (EP,US);
E21B10/55 (US);
E21B10/56 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | E21B10/567, E21B10/42, E21B10/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | BOHRMEISSELSCHNEIDELEMENT UND BOHRMEISSEL DAMIT | [2022/35] | English: | DRILL BIT CUTTER ELEMENTS AND DRILL BITS INCLUDING SAME | [2022/35] | French: | ÉLÉMENTS DE COUPE DE TRÉPAN ET TRÉPANS ÉQUIPÉS DESDITS ÉLÉMENTS DE COUPE | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 13.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5752573 (SCOTT DANNY E [US], et al); | [XI]US2005269139 (SHEN YUELIN [US], et al); | [A]US2014262545 (AZAR MICHAEL G [US], et al); | [A]US2015259988 (CHEN CHEN [US], et al); | [A]WO2017087920 (SMITH INTERNATIONAL [US]); | [X]US2019010763 (CROCKETT RONALD B [US], et al); | [X]US2019100967 (RUSSELL STEVEN CRAIG [US], et al); | [A]WO2019128956 (KINGDREAM PLC [CN]); | [A]US2019242192 (BELLIN FEDERICO [US], et al) | International search | [XY]US5752573 (SCOTT DANNY E [US], et al); | [Y]US2007175672 (EYRE RONALD K [US], et al); | [Y]US2017096859 (SPENCER REED W [US]) | by applicant | US5752573 | US2005269139 | US2019010763 | US2019100967 |