EP4049999 - CRYSTAL FORM OF HYPOXIA-INDUCIBLE FACTOR-PROLYL HYDROXYLASE INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crystal Pharmaceutical (Suzhou) Co., Ltd. B4-301 Biobay 218 Xinghu Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Minhua B4-301 Biobay, 218 Xinghu Street, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 02 /
WU, Kelin B4-301 Biobay, 218 Xinghu Street, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 03 /
SHI, Jiaming B4-301 Biobay, 218 Xinghu Street, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20879078.2 | 28.09.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020CN118386 | Priority number, date | CN20191107235 | 22.10.2019 Original published format: CN201911007235 | CN20201057113 | 17.01.2020 Original published format: CN202010057113 | CN202010198275 | 19.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010198275 | [2022/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021077994 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4049999 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D217/26, A61K31/472, A61P13/12, A61P7/06 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
A61P7/06 (EP,CN,KR);
C07D217/26 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K31/472 (CN,KR);
C07D215/48 (US);
A61P13/12 (EP,CN,KR);
C07B2200/13 (CN,KR,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | KRISTALLFORM DES HYPOXIE-INDUZIERBAREN FAKTOR-PROLYL-HYDROXYLASE-INHIBITORS | [2022/35] | English: | CRYSTAL FORM OF HYPOXIA-INDUCIBLE FACTOR-PROLYL HYDROXYLASE INHIBITOR | [2022/35] | French: | FORME CRISTALLINE D'UN INHIBITEUR DE LA PROLYLE HYDROXYLASE DU FACTEUR INDUCTIBLE PAR HYPOXIE | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2022 | Translation filed | 03.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 14.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO2013013609 (ZHEJIANG BETA PHARMA INC [CN], et al) [ID] 1-11 * examples 7, 11; claims 1, 89, 101; compound VI *; | [ID]WO2014014835 (FIBROGEN INC [US]) [ID] 1-11* claims 1, 55, 64; table 1 *; | [XDI]CN109369525 (ANLITE SHANGHAI MEDICINE TECH CO LTD, et al) [XD] 1-3,6-11 * paragraph [0225]; figure 13; claims 1, 6, 8, 10 * [I] 1-11 |