EP4006633 - DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Jong Hyun 129, Samsung-ro,Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Jun Su 129, Samsung-ro,Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
CHAE, Hyun Joong 129, Samsung-ro,Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Beom Han 129, Samsung-ro,Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Byoung Jung 129, Samsung-ro,Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
OH, Jun Pil 129, Samsung-ro,Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 07 /
JEONG, Kyo 129, Samsung-ro,Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20879482.6 | 17.04.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020KR05148 | Priority number, date | KR20190134039 | 25.10.2019 Original published format: KR 20190134039 | [2022/22] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021080100 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4006633 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4006633 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1333 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
G02F1/133314 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/133308 (KR);
G02F1/133317 (EP,KR);
G02F1/13332 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/133322 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/133504 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/22] | English: | DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2022/22] | French: | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2022 | Translation filed | 28.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/27] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20030088577 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]US2011051033 (SHIMIZU SHINJI [JP]); | [XYI]US2011221995 (PARK WOON-YONG [KR]); | [A]EP2680063 (INNOLUX CORP [TW]); | [A]WO2016101371 (SHENZHEN CHINA STAR OPTOELECT [CN]) | International search | [Y]KR20090057788 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20150069145 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20160148103 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20170126562 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2019137829 (KIM JI SOO [KR], et al) |