EP3930011 - POWER FEED DEVICE OF AN OPTICAL POWER FEED SYSTEM AND OPTICAL POWER FEED SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/52] | POWER RECEIVING DEVICE FOR OPTICAL POWER FEED SYSTEM, POWER FEED DEVICE, AND OPTICAL POWER FEED SYSTEM | ||
[2023/40] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Takahiro c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION, 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2024/10] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Takahiro Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20879603.7 | 15.10.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020JP38944 | Priority number, date | JP20190193121 | 24.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019193121 | JP20190195210 | 28.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019195210 | [2021/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021079822 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3930011 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3930011 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/30, H02J50/80, H04B10/80 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
H02J50/30 (EP,CN);
H04B10/25 (US);
G02B6/4206 (US);
H01S5/042 (US);
H02J50/80 (EP);
H04B10/07955 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | H02J50/30, H02J50/80, H04B10/80, H01S5/022, H01S5/0683 | ||
Former IPC [2021/52] | H01L31/10, H02J50/30, H01S5/022, H01S5/0683, H04B10/071, H04B10/80 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINES OPTISCHEN LEISTUNGSVERSORGUNGSSYSTEMS UND OPTISCHES LEISTUNGSVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/40] | English: | POWER FEED DEVICE OF AN OPTICAL POWER FEED SYSTEM AND OPTICAL POWER FEED SYSTEM | [2023/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE D'UN SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE OPTIQUE ET SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE OPTIQUE | [2023/40] |
Former [2021/52] | LEISTUNGSEMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN OPTISCHES STROMVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM, STROMVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND OPTISCHES STROMVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2021/52] | POWER RECEIVING DEVICE FOR OPTICAL POWER FEED SYSTEM, POWER FEED DEVICE, AND OPTICAL POWER FEED SYSTEM | ||
Former [2021/52] | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION D'ÉNERGIE POUR SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE OPTIQUE, DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE ET SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE OPTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2021 | Translation filed | 22.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 05.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
SE | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH1189120 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 15] , [0 19] , [0 24]; figure 3 * [Y] 9 [I] 3,4,6-8,17,18; | [XAYI]US9979480 (SCHUBERT MARTIN F [US]) [X] 10,11,17,18 * figures 1A, 1C * * column 2, line 41 - line 62 * * column 3, lines 33-43, 56-67 * [A] 13-16 [Y] 9[I] 12 | International search | [A]JPH10510418 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-18* , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JPH1189120 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-18 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2001025180 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-18 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2015001925 (FUJI MACHINE MFG) [A] 1-18 * , entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | JP2010135989 |