Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
16.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
17.10.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
13.10.2023 | Change - classification | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
13.10.2023 | Change - classification | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
01.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.12.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] |
23.12.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] |
02.09.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.07.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
29.07.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
04.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.04.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.04.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.04.2022 | Change - representative | |
08.04.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.05.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.05.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |