EP4050784 - POWER SUPPLY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GU, Minglei c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
KANOUDA, Akihiko c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20879815.7 | 17.08.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020JP30947 | Priority number, date | JP20190191826 | 21.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019191826 | [2022/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021079593 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4050784 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/28, H02M7/12, H02M7/162, H02M7/219, H02M7/23, H02M1/00, H02M1/32, H02M1/42, H02M3/335, H02M7/49 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
H02M1/008 (EP);
H02M1/42 (CN);
H02M1/007 (EP,US);
H02M1/0016 (US);
H02M1/0074 (EP);
H02M1/4208 (EP,US);
H02M3/33569 (US);
H02M7/162 (EP);
H02M7/219 (EP,CN);
H02M1/32 (EP);
H02M1/4233 (EP);
H02M3/335 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | H02M3/28, H02M7/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | STROMVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/35] | English: | POWER SUPPLY DEVICE | [2022/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2022 | Translation filed | 23.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 15.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - GAO ZHIXUAN ET AL, "Analysis of Maximum Load Unbalancing Limits of Cascaded H-Bridge Rectifier Under Unity Power Factor", IEEE ACCESS, (20161205), vol. 7, doi:10.1109/ACCESS.2019.2931070, pages 102530 - 102541, XP011738657 [X] 1-5 * pages 1-6; figures 1-14 * [I] 6,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACCESS.2019.2931070 | [A] - OUYANG SHAODI ET AL, "Reactive component injection control of the modular multi-output power electronic transformer", 2016 IEEE 2ND ANNUAL SOUTHERN POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE (SPEC), IEEE, (20161205), doi:10.1109/SPEC.2016.7846187, pages 1 - 7, XP033059746 [A] 1-7 * pages 1-6; figures 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SPEC.2016.7846187 | [A] - JIAO NING ET AL, "Analysis of Load Balancing Limits for Cascaded Rectifiers", 2018 IEEE 4TH SOUTHERN POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE (SPEC), IEEE, (20181210), doi:10.1109/SPEC.2018.8635861, pages 1 - 7, XP033515699 [A] 1-7 * pages 1-3; figures 1-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SPEC.2018.8635861 | International search | [A]JP2018038228 (TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI ELEC IND) [A] 1-7; | [A]JP2018046601 (SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MFG) [A] 1-7; | [A]WO2019071331 (OSSIACO INC [CA])[A] 1-7 | by applicant | - M. MOOSAVIG. FARIVARH. IMAN-EINIS. M. SHEKARABI, "A voltage balancing strategy with extended operating region for cascaded H-bridge converters", IEEE Transactions on Power Electronics, (20140900), vol. 29, no. 9, doi:10.1109/TPEL.2013.2286270, pages 5044 - 5053, XP011546745 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPEL.2013.2286270 |