EP4048246 - MITOCHONDRIA-TARGETED ATOVAQUONE: A MORE POTENT AND MORE EFFECTIVE ANTITUMOR, ANTIMICROBIAL, AND ANTIMALARIAL DRUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Medical College of Wisconsin, Inc. 8701 Watertown Plank Road Milwaukee, WI 53226 / US | For all designated states Aix-Marseille Université Institut de Chimie Radicalaire (ICR) UMR 7273 Equipe SREP, Service 521 Campus de Saint Jérome Ave. Escadrille-Normandie-Niemen 13397 Marseille / FR | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALYANARAMAN, Balaraman 1604 N. 118th Street Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53226 / US | 02 /
CHENG, Gang 8701 Watertown Plank Road Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53226 / US | 03 /
HARDY, Micael Joël 53, rue Antoine Joseph Benedittine 30900 Nimes / FR | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20880080.5 | 26.10.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020US57363 | Priority number, date | US201962925619P | 24.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962925619 P | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021081500 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4048246 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4048246 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/54, A61K31/12, A61K31/122, A61K45/06, A61K31/662 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/66 (US);
A61K31/122 (EP,US);
A61K31/662 (EP);
A61P35/00 (US);
C07C49/84 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/122, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/662, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/35] | A61K31/12, A61K31/122, A61K31/662, C07C50/00, C07C50/26, C07C50/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITOCHONDRIA-GEZIELTES ATOVAQUON: POTENTERE UND WIRKSAMERE ANTITUMOR-, ANTIMIKROBIELLE UND ANTIMALARIA-ARZNEIMITTEL | [2022/35] | English: | MITOCHONDRIA-TARGETED ATOVAQUONE: A MORE POTENT AND MORE EFFECTIVE ANTITUMOR, ANTIMICROBIAL, AND ANTIMALARIAL DRUG | [2022/35] | French: | ATOVAQUONE CIBLÉE SUR LES MITOCHONDRIES : MÉDICAMENT ANTITUMORAL, ANTIMICROBIEN ET ANTIPALUDIQUE PLUS PUISSANT ET PLUS EFFICACE | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 12.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2018213751 (LUNELLA BIOTECH INC [CA], et al); | [Y]WO2019104115 (LUNELLA BIOTECH INC [CA], et al); | [Y]WO2019108729 (LUNELLA BIOTECH INC [CA], et al); | International search | [A]US4981874 (LATTER VICTORIA S [GB], et al); | [A]US2009221715 (KUMAR ASHOK [IN], et al); | [A]US2011004024 (SARALYA SANJAY SUKUMAR [IN], et al); | by applicant | WO2018213751 | WO2019108729 |