EP3957329 - COMPOSITION FOR TREATING CANCER, APPLICATION THEREOF, AND DRUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newish Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. Room 103, Level 1, Tower B No. 18 Xihuan South Road Economic & Technical Development Zone Beijing 100176 / CN | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Zhongjie Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
QI, Hai long Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Li gong Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
XIE, Huangfan Beijing 100176 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Defang Beijing 100176 / CN | 06 /
YAN, Xiao E Beijing 100176 / CN | 07 /
LI, Weiwei Beijing 100176 / CN | 08 /
WANG, Xiaofang Beijing 100176 / CN | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 20880381.7 | 19.08.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020CN109967 | Priority number, date | CN202010641456 | 06.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010641456 | [2022/08] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022007135 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957329 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K31/444, A61K31/496, A61K31/351, A61P35/00, A61K31/352, A61K31/355, A61K31/404, A61K31/44, A61K31/4439, A61K31/47, A61K31/4709, A61K31/5025, A61K31/506, A61K31/517, A61K31/53 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,CN);
A61K38/005 (US);
A61K31/351 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/352 (EP);
A61K31/355 (EP);
A61K31/404 (EP);
A61K31/44 (EP);
A61K31/4439 (EP);
A61K31/444 (EP,CN);
A61K31/47 (EP);
A61K31/4709 (EP);
A61K31/496 (EP,CN);
A61K31/5025 (EP);
A61K31/506 (EP);
A61K31/517 (EP);
A61K31/53 (EP);
A61K38/179 (US);
A61K38/1866 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/351, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP);
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/404, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/444, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP);
A61K31/44, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4709, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/47, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/496, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP);
A61K31/5025, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/506, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS UND VERWENDUNG UND MEDIKAMENT DAVON | [2022/08] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR TREATING CANCER, APPLICATION THEREOF, AND DRUG | [2022/08] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER, SON APPLICATION ET MÉDICAMENT | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2021 | Translation filed | 07.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 19.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2014336129 (WEIHUA ZHANG [US]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0047]; claims 15-20 *; | [Y]WO2020068661 (LEXICON PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [Y] 1-11 * page 18 *; | [Y] - JOSEP TABERNERO, "The Role of VEGF and EGFR Inhibition: Implications for Combining Anti?VEGF and Anti?EGFR Agents", MOLECULAR CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20070301), vol. 5, no. 3, doi:10.1158/1541-7786.MCR-06-0404, ISSN 1541-7786, pages 203 - 220, XP007919026 [Y] 1-11 * pages 203-205; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1541-7786.MCR-06-0404 | [Y] - K. L. MEADOWS ET AL, "Anti-VEGF Therapies in the Clinic", COLD SPRING HARBOR PERSPECTIVES IN MEDICINE, (20121001), vol. 2, no. 10, doi:10.1101/cshperspect.a006577, pages a006577 - a006577, XP055376215 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/cshperspect.a006577 |