EP4024333 - OBJECT DETECTION DEVICE, OBJECT DETECTION METHOD, OBJECT DETECTION PROGRAM, LEARNING DEVICE, LEARNING METHOD AND LEARNING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/27] | OBJECT DETECTION DEVICE, OBJECT DETECTION METHOD, OBJECT DETECTION PROGRAM, AND LEARNING DEVICE | ||
[2023/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISANO, Shoto c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
NAKAO, Takamasa c/o Mitsubishi Electric Information Systems Corporation, 13-23, Shibaura 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0023 / JP | 03 /
ABE, Hirokazu c/o Mitsubishi Electric Information Systems Corporation, 13-23, Shibaura 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0023 / JP | 04 /
TOKUDA, Yuuki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Information Systems Corporation, 13-23, Shibaura 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0023 / JP | 05 /
YAMATARI, Mitsuyoshi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Information Systems Corporation, 13-23, Shibaura 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0023 / JP | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20881785.8 | 30.06.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020JP25708 | Priority number, date | JP20190196150 | 29.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019196150 | [2022/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021084797 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024333 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4024333 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06V10/22, G06V10/25 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
G06V10/22 (EP,US);
G06T7/0002 (CN);
G06T7/187 (US);
G06N3/04 (CN);
G06N3/08 (CN);
G06T7/11 (US);
G06V10/235 (EP);
G06V10/25 (EP);
G06V10/32 (EP);
G06V10/70 (US);
G06V10/803 (EP);
G06V20/56 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | G06T7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBJEKT-DETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG, OBJEKT-DETEKTIONSVERFAHREN, OBJEKT-DETEKTIONSPROGRAMM, LERNVORRICHTUNG, LERNVERFAHREN UND LERNPROGRAMM | [2023/18] | English: | OBJECT DETECTION DEVICE, OBJECT DETECTION METHOD, OBJECT DETECTION PROGRAM, LEARNING DEVICE, LEARNING METHOD AND LEARNING PROGRAM | [2023/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'OBJET, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'OBJET, PROGRAMME DE DÉTECTION D'OBJET, DISPOSITIF D'APPRENTISSAGE, PROCÉDÉ D'APPRENTISSAGE ET PROGRAMME D'APPRENTISSAGE | [2023/18] |
Former [2022/27] | OBJEKT-DETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG, OBJEKT-DETEKTIONSVERFAHREN, OBJEKT-DETEKTIONSPROGRAMM UND LERNVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2022/27] | OBJECT DETECTION DEVICE, OBJECT DETECTION METHOD, OBJECT DETECTION PROGRAM, AND LEARNING DEVICE | ||
Former [2022/27] | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'OBJET, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'OBJET, PROGRAMME DE DÉTECTION D'OBJET ET DISPOSITIF D'APPRENTISSAGE | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2022 | Translation filed | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 14.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2570963 (CLARION CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4-8 * paragraphs [0019] - [0035]; figure 3 *; | [I]EP2741253 (MEGACHIPS CORP [JP]) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0017] - [0072] *; | [I]US2017206426 (SCHRIER MADELINE JANE [US], et al) [I] 1,4-8* paragraphs [0002] - [0052] *; | [A] - HASELHOFF A ET AL, "A vehicle detection system based on Haar and Triangle features", INTELLIGENT VEHICLES SYMPOSIUM, 2009 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090603), ISBN 978-1-4244-3503-6, pages 261 - 266, XP031489851 [A] 1,4-8 * Section 3.1. * | International search | [Y]JP2009123081 (FUJIFILM CORP) [Y] 2-3, 8-9* , paragraphs [0029]-[0032], [0047] *; | [XY]JP2013037488 (MEGA CHIPS CORP) [X] 1, 4-7, 10-12 * , paragraphs [0041]-[0046], [0061], fig. 3A-3C * [Y] 2-3, 8-9 | by applicant | JP2019003396 |