EP4044444 - METHOD FOR REPORTING CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAI, Shijie Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Xueru Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Kunpeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ZHOU, Yongxing Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20882315.3 | 26.10.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020CN123556 | Priority number, date | CN20191137224 | 29.10.2019 Original published format: CN201911037224 | [2022/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021083068 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4044444 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0413, H04B7/0417, H04B7/06, H04B7/0456 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
H04B7/0456 (EP,CN);
H04B7/0413 (CN);
H04B7/0626 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/0417 (EP);
H04B7/0617 (US);
H04B7/0634 (EP,US);
H04B7/0639 (EP);
H04B7/0663 (EP);
H04B7/10 (EP);
H04L1/0026 (CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | H04B7/0413 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM MELDEN VON KANALZUSTANDSINFORMATIONEN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSGERÄT | [2022/33] | English: | METHOD FOR REPORTING CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS | [2022/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RAPPORT D'INFORMATIONS D'ÉTAT DE CANAL ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2022 | Translation filed | 27.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 28.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI] - ERICSSON, "On CSI enhancements for MU-MIMO", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20190826 - 20190830, (20190904), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1909523 ON CSI ENHANCEMENTS FOR MU-MIMO REVISED, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98/Docs/R1-1909523.zip, (20190904), XP051766126 [X] 1-5,7-9,13-15 * page 1 - page 10 * * page 13 - page 19 * [Y] 10-12 [I] 6 | [YA] - FRAUNHOFER IIS ET AL, "Enhancements on Type-II CSI reporting", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20190826 - 20190830, (20190816), pages 1 - 15, 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1908935_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98/Docs/R1-1908935.zip, (20190816), XP051765542 [Y] 10-12 * page 1 - page 11 * [A] 1-9,13-15 | [A] - ZTE, "CSI Enhancement for MU-MIMO Support", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, CZ; 20190826 - 20190830, (20190817), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1908190 CSI ENHANCEMENT FOR MU-MIMO SUPPORT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98/Docs/R1-1908190.zip, (20190817), XP051764809 [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 10 * |